Smith v. Stellar Restoration Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Kim Smith
Defendant: Stellar Restoration Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv05081
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #4 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Based on the Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens filed by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. (Brost, Ashley) Modified on 2/3/2021 to add text (KLE).
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4 MOTION to DISMISS Based on First-Filed Rule, or in the Alternative, Based on Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens by Kim Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Kim Smith, #2 Exhibit Letter to Suster)(LaFleur, Jon)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to DISMISS Based on First-Filed Rule, or in the Alternative, Based on Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens filed by Kim Smith. (LaFleur, Jon)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Stellar Restoration Services, LLC for Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. (Brost, Ashley)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bryan Burg for Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 1/6/21. (SB)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Bryan H. Burg to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3456932) by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. (Brost, Ashley)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS Based on First-Filed Rule, or in the Alternative, Based on Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens of Ashley R. Brost filed by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer and Request for Disclosure) (Brost, Ashley)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to DISMISS Based on First-Filed Rule, or in the Alternative, Based on Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens filed by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. (Brost, Ashley)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS Based on First-Filed Rule, or in the Alternative, Based on Doctrine of Forum Non Conveniens by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC. (Brost, Ashley)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by Kim Smith Demand for Jury Trial. (LaFleur, Jon)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE re: Rule 73. (Attachments: #1 AO85 Form)(SAC)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stellar Restoration Services, LLC from Pennington County Circuit Court, case number 51CIV20-001603. ($402.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3453945) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Stellar Restoration Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stellar Restoration Services, LLC
Represented By: Vincent M. Roche
Represented By: Ashley R. Brost
Represented By: Bryan Burg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Smith
Represented By: Jon J. LaFleur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?