Stover v. Saul
Plaintiff: Crispeen Anne Stover
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv05028
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE as to the Attorney General of the United States. (MSB)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #10 Summons Issued as to USA - IFP Cases, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Andrew Saul. (Roche, Meghan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE as to United States Attorney. (MSB)
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Roche on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Roche, Meghan)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 Individual Capacity Service Letter from Clerk's Office to Crispeen Stover. (Attachments: #1 AO 85, #2 Blank Summons, #3 Blank USM 285, #4 Sample Summons and USM 285 forms) (SLW)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul in their official capacities. Original summons, AO 85, #1 Complaint, #9 Order delivered via certified mail to each defendant. Delivered copies of summons(es), A0 85, #1 Complaint, #9 Order to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General via certified mail. (SLW)
May 12, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 5/12/21. (SB)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 5/10/21. (SB)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. The Clerks Office shall arrange to train the pro se litigant on how to e-file documents and give the litigant access to CM/ECF once training is complete. The ability of the pro se filer to e-file documents may be revoked anytime the Court deems it justified. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 5/10/21. (SB)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Electronically File Documents pursuant to e-filing registration request filed in PACER. Pro se party Crispeen Anne Stover will continue to receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Crispeen Anne Stover. Pro se party Crispeen Anne Stover will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with an Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
April 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Crispeen Anne Stover. (MSB)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT on Social Security Appeal. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stover v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crispeen Anne Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel - Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?