Mousseaux v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Keva Fly Mousseaux
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv05031
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Government's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due on or before 8/18/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 07/07/2021. (KLE)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Hofmann (USA), Michaele)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michaele S. Hofmann (USA) on behalf of United States of America. (Hofmann (USA), Michaele)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to USA. Summmons(es), AO 85, and Rule 73 Memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery to plaintiffs attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SKK)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3545821, in shell case on 5/14/21 filed by Keva Fly Mousseaux on 5/14/21. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mousseaux v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michaele S. Hofmann (USA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keva Fly Mousseaux
Represented By: Terry L. Pechota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?