Burgard et al v. Kemper Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Robert Burgard and TP Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Kemper Insurance Company and Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv05060
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - vehicle policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - 05-20-2019 letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - 06-04-2019 letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - 06-10-219 letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - 10-16-2019 letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - 04-12-2021 Final PreTrial Order) (Eden, Shane)
November 24, 2021 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
November 24, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
November 24, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Trinity Universal Insurance for Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
November 24, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
November 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Kemper Insurance Company . (Eden, Shane)
November 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Kemper Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
October 28, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Larry Deiter Acknowledgement filed by Robert Burgard. (Beardsley, Michael)
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Amended Summons Issued as to Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Kemper Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Amended Summons, #2 AO85)(MSB)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Robert Burgard. (Beardsley, Michael)
October 12, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Error: #5 Request for Issuance of Summons was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Beardsley, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Filing 5 (Filed in Error) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Robert Burgard. (Beardsley, Michael) Modified on 10/12/2021 (MSB).
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand . (Beardsley, Michael)
October 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kemper Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(MSB)
October 1, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Robert Burgard. (Beardsley, Michael)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3639455, in shell case on 09/29/2021 filed by TP Enterprises, Inc., Robert Burgard on 09/29/2021. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgard et al v. Kemper Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Burgard
Represented By: Michael S. Beardsley
Represented By: Steven C. Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TP Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael S. Beardsley
Represented By: Steven C. Beardsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kemper Insurance Company
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?