Nygaard v. Skywest Airlines et al
Plaintiff: Michael Nygaard
Defendant: Skywest AIrlines, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Chubb Limited and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 5:2022cv05010
Filed: January 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Chubb Limited terminated.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/4/2022. (DJP)
March 4, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Michael Nygaard. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lee, Brad)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/4/2022. (DJP)
March 4, 2022 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Skywest Airlines identifying Corporate Parent SkyWest, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for Skywest Airlines. (Hieb, Jack)
March 4, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Skywest Airlines. (Dorsett, Kimberly)
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Dorsett on behalf of Skywest Airlines. (Dorsett, Kimberly)
March 4, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of Skywest Airlines. (Hieb, Jack)
March 2, 2022 Filing 11 Amended NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Hieb, Jack) Modified docket text on 3/3/2022 (MSB).
February 25, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Indemnity Insurance Company of North America on 02/16/2022 (Lee, Brad)
February 25, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Chubb Limited, Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Corporation, Other Affiliate INA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Ace American Insurance Company for Indemnity Insurance Company of North America. (Hieb, Jack)
February 25, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sedgwick, L.P., Other Affiliate Sedgwick Global, Inc., Other Affiliate Lightning Cayman Merger Sub. Ltd. for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hieb, Jack)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly A. Dorsett on behalf of Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Dorsett, Kimberly)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hieb, Jack)
February 18, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Chubb Limited, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Hieb, Jack) Modified to change docket text to add notice and term motion per chambers on 2/22/2022 (MSB).
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. on 01/31/22 (Lee, Brad)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Skywest Airlines on 01/31/22 (Lee, Brad)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chubb Limited, Indemnity Insurance Company of North America, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Skywest AIrlines. Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
January 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3715543, in shell case on 1/27/2022 filed by Michael Nygaard on 1/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition for Hearing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Compromise Settlement Agreement and Release, #3 Exhibit 3 - Various letters and emails) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nygaard v. Skywest Airlines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nygaard
Represented By: Brad J. Lee
Represented By: Gary D. Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skywest AIrlines
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dorsett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dorsett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indemnity Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Kimberly A. Dorsett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?