Sawyer v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Judith Sawyer
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2022cv05014
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey L Viken
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (E.R.I.S.A.)
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of upcoming case reassignment and opportunity to consent under Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 consent form) (MWT)
March 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Shillingstad, Hal)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bensy Benjamin for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/7/22. (SB)
March 1, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company answer due 3/25/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 3/1/22. (SB)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Bensy Benjamin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3736811) by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Shillingstad, Hal)
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Shillingstad, Hal)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order For Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time) (Shillingstad, Hal)
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal A. Shillingstad on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Shillingstad, Hal)
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Larry Deiter, SD Div of Insurance Director Acknowledgement filed by Judith Sawyer. (Simpson, Michael)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(DLC)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX500006813. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Sawyer
Represented By: Michael J. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Bensy Benjamin
Represented By: Hal A. Shillingstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?