Marquez v. Peterson et al
Plaintiff: Christina M. Marquez
Defendant: Nicholas J. Peterson, Pennington County Public Defender's Office, Pennington County States Attorney's Office and Rachael Lindsay
Case Number: 5:2024cv05041
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christina M. Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SKK)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Have U.S. Marshalls [sic] Serve Defendants by Christina M. Marquez. (SKK)
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendants Rachael Lindsay, Pennington County Public Defender's Office, Pennington County States Attorney's Office on 07/10/2024 (SAC) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/23/2024) (SAC).
July 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Nicholas J. Peterson on 6/26/2024 (SAC)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Williams, Richard)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Case Summary 51CR121-003153 Redacted) (Williams, Richard)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by Rachael Lindsay, Pennington County Public Defender's Office, Pennington County States Attorney's Office, Nicholas J. Peterson. (Williams, Richard)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Rachael Lindsay, Pennington County Public Defender's Office, Pennington County States Attorney's Office, Nicholas J. Peterson. (Williams, Richard)
July 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Williams on behalf of All Defendants. (Williams, Richard)
June 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rachael Lindsay, Pennington County Public Defender's Office, Pennington County States Attorney's Office, Nicholas J. Peterson. 4 Summons(es), AO 85 form and Rule 73 delivered via hand delivery in RC clerk's office to Pro Se Plaintiff (SAC)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and incorrectly completed summons(es) or no summons(es). A new case has been opened. We are unable to issue summon(es) at this time. Enclosed is a blank summons form and a sample completed summons form. Follow the enclosed instructions to properly complete your summons(es). As soon as the Clerks Office receives your properly completed summons(es), it/they will be issued. Copy of docket sheet, blank summons form, and sample completed summons form with instructions sent to plaintiff. Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice handed to plaintiff at counter. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SKK)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# 50000769, filed by Christina M. Marquez. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez v. Peterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas J. Peterson
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennington County Public Defender's Office
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennington County States Attorney's Office
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Lindsay
Represented By: Richard M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?