Moeller et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company and Jeffrey Moeller
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv05060
Filed: August 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY GREGORY L. SCHUCK granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gregory L. Schuck for Ford Motor Company. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 09/18/2024. (ARW)
September 17, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Gregory L. Schuck to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4370984) by Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/28/2024. (ARW)
August 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO ADMIT NONRESIDENT ATTORNEY RYAN L. WOODY granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ryan L. Woody for Jeffrey Moeller and The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/28/2024. (ARW)
August 27, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent State Street Corporation, Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company, Other Affiliate Jiangling Motors Corporation, Limited, Other Affiliate Ford Otomotiv Sanayi Anonim Sirketi, Other Affiliate Ford Otosan, Other Affiliate Ford Credit Canada Company, Other Affiliate FCE Bank plc, Other Affiliate Ford Automotive Finance (China) Limited for Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
August 27, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 with Jury Demand Answer of Defendant Ford Motor Company by Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
August 27, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Ryan L. Woody to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4355913) by Jeffrey Moeller, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Bornitz, Michael)
August 16, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate The Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Bornitz, Michael)
August 14, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Haigh on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
August 9, 2024 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Ford Motor Company served on C T Corporation System. (Bornitz, Michael)
August 6, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. 1 Summons delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms . (SKK)
August 5, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4340470, in shell case on 8-5-24 filed by Jeffrey Moeller, The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeller et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael D. Bornitz
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Moeller
Represented By: Michael D. Bornitz
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Gregory L. Schuck
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?