Brave Heart v. Department of Interior et al
Plaintiff: Frank S. Brave Heart
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs and Department of Interior
Estate: Louis P. Brave Heart
Case Number: 5:2024cv05072
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Charles B Kornmann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 11/07/2024. (JMS) Modified on 11/7/2024 mailed four summons, four USM 285, and sample summons to Frank Brave Heart. (JMS).
November 5, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frank S. Brave Heart. (JMS)
September 24, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Copy of docket sheet and application to proceed IFP sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SKK)
September 23, 2024 Filing 4 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Frank S. Brave Heart. Pro se party Frank S. Brave Heart will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (SKK)
September 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Frank S. Brave Heart. (SKK)
September 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Frank S. Brave Heart. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brave Heart v. Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank S. Brave Heart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate: Louis P. Brave Heart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?