Lipsky v. Piersol
Plaintiff: Daniel Robert Lipsky
Defendant: Judge Lawrence Piersol
Case Number: 5:2024cv05074
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Camela C Theeler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Brown on behalf of Lawrence Piersol. (Brown, Trevor)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Lawrence Piersol on Lawrence Leroy Piersol (Lipsky, Daniel)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting 6 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. The Clerks office shall give the pro se litigant access to electronically file documents in the CM/ECF system. The ability of the defendant to e-file documents may be revoked anytime the Court deems it justified. Signed by U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler on 11/8/2024. (CR)
November 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Daniel Robert Lipsky is currently receiving electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (request received via telephone call) (JLS)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lawrence Piersol. Summons(es) delivered via US Postal Service to Pro Se Plaintiff with AO 85 form CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (DJP) (DJP).
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REGISTRATION for Electronic Notice by Daniel Robert Lipsky. Pro se party Daniel Robert Lipsky will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier recused. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/23/2024. cc: sent to Daniel Robert Lipsky via USPS. (KLE)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order U.S. District Judge Camela C. Theeler added. (SLW)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Copy of docket sheet and application to proceed IFP sent to plaintiff. Pro Se Litigant Registration Form for Electronic Notice also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Pursuant to the E-Government Act and D.S.D. Civ. LR 5.2, you must redact personal identifiers from documents submitted to the Court. The Clerks Office will not review for compliance. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed of the plaintiff's address changes, including changes to primary and secondary email addresses. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (KLE)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Robert Lipsky. (KLE)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Civil Filing Fee Received from Daniel Robert Lipsky. Fee Amount: $405, Receipt No.: #500000898. (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipsky v. Piersol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Robert Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Lawrence Piersol
Represented By: Trevor Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?