Zaidman v. Penton-Zaidman
Petitioner: Simon Zaidman
Respondent: Molly Penton-Zaidman
Counter-Defendant: Simon Zaidman
Counter-Claimant: Molly Penton-Zaidman
Case Number: 5:2024cv05077
Filed: October 4, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing to add days and change courtroom: Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/3/2025 at 09:00 AM in Rapid City Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/4/2025 at 09:00 AM in Rapid City Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/5/2025 at 09:00 AM in Rapid City Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. (TAL)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/16/2025. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/26/2024. (SAC)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER by Simon Zaidman Proposed Stipulated Pretrial Scheduling Order (Kinney, Kimberly)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER Received from United States Department of State to The Court. (SAC) Modified to seal due to juvenile names and emailed to counsel on 11/15/2024 (DJP).
November 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/3/2025 at 09:00 AM MDT in Rapid City Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. (SAC) Modified docket text on 11/1/2024 (SAC).
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/31/2024. (SAC)
October 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER by Molly Penton-Zaidman STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER (Schlimgen, Eric)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nicholas Traylor for Molly Penton-Zaidman. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/30/2024. (SAC)
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 VERIFIED ANSWER to #1 Petition For Return of the Children to Mexico, Counterclaim of Molly Penton-Zaidman, First COUNTERCLAIM against Simon Zaidman by Molly Penton-Zaidman. (Schlimgen, Eric) Modified on 10/29/2024 to link to correct document. (JMS).
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Nicholas Traylor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (ASDDC-4396676) by Molly Penton-Zaidman. (Schlimgen, Eric) Modified on 10/29/2024 to add receipt number (SLT).
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #11 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Schlimgen, Eric)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) Verfied ANSWER to #1 Petition For Return of the Children to Mexico, First COUNTERCLAIM against Molly Penton-Zaidman by Molly Penton-Zaidman. (Schlimgen, Eric) Modified on 10/29/2024 (JMS).
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Response to Motion, #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Schlimgen, Eric)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION for Attorney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice Nicholas Traylor filed by Molly Penton-Zaidman. (Schlimgen, Eric) Modified on 10/25/2024 - contacted atty to refile using the correct event and pay the fee (SAC).
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ashley V. Tomlinson for Molly Penton-Zaidman. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/23/2024. (SAC)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RECEIPT for Passport of T.Z. (SLT)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECEIPT for Passport of C.Z. (SLT)
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing (location only): Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/6/2024 at 10:00 AM in Rapid City Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. (TAL)
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Ashley V. Tomlinson to be admitted pro hac vici (500000935) filed by Molly Penton-Zaidman. (Schlimgen, Eric) Modified on 10/23/2024 to change to a motion.(JMS). Modified on 10/29/2024 (SLT).
October 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard Min for Simon Zaidman. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/17/2024. (SAC)
October 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Richard Min to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4389630) by Simon Zaidman. (Kinney, Kimberly)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/10/2024. (EMAILED copy of Order and Complaint to Mr. Schlimgen at eric@schlimgenlawfirm.com, eric.schlimgen@gmail.com and doris@schlimgenlawfirm.com). (SAC)
October 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Preliminary Injunction Evidentiary Hearing set for 11/6/2024 at 10:00 AM MDT in Rapid City Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/10/2024. (SAC)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Molly Penton-Zaidman. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SAC)
October 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $405 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4382436, in shell case on 10/04/2024 filed by Simon Zaidman. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Convention on the Civil Aspects of International Child Abduction, #2 Ex. 2 - Title 22. Foreign Relations and Intercourse) (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zaidman v. Penton-Zaidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Simon Zaidman
Represented By: Kimberly Kinney
Represented By: Richard Min
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Molly Penton-Zaidman
Represented By: Ashley V. Tomlinson
Represented By: Nicholas Traylor
Represented By: Nicholas Traylor
Represented By: Eric M. Schlimgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Simon Zaidman
Represented By: Richard Min
Represented By: Kimberly Kinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Molly Penton-Zaidman
Represented By: Ashley V. Tomlinson
Represented By: Nicholas Traylor
Represented By: Nicholas Traylor
Represented By: Eric M. Schlimgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?