Craig v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Plaintiff: Craig, Wesley Waldrop, John Phillip Werner, Nathan Rogers, Christopher Genther, Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin and Matthew Van Vorst
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (TV2) and Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00074
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 158 STIPULATION of Dismissal Case by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER APPROVING FLSA SETTLEMENT granting #151 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement by Charlene Craig. The proposed settlement is APPROVED as a fair and reasonable compromise of a bona fide issue of law and fact. The parties are ORDERED to submit a proper stipulation of dismissal of the case with prejudice within 21 days.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/21/2018. (BJL, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 156 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Elizabeth Coffey of Hearing on Motion to Approve Setllement before Judge Lee on September 20, 2018. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge Lee on September 20, 2018. By s/ Elizabeth Coffey. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (EBC, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Motion Hearing held on 9/20/2018 re #151 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement filed by Charlene Craig. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Coffey) (CNC, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 154 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #146 Order and #147 Judgment. (BJL, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 153 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Compliance with September 5, 2018 (Doc. 152) by Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Van Remmen, Gordon)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re #151 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement filed by Charlene Craig: Hearing on the Motion is set for 9/20/2018 03:00 PM (Eastern) in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Counsel for Plaintiffs SHALL provide each of the 94 Plaintiffs with notice of the hearing and a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/5/2018. (BJL, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION to Approve Settlement by Charlene Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Lampros)(Lampros, Andrew)
August 27, 2018 Filing 150 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Return To Sender/Unable to Forward: Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #144 Order on Motion for Settlement. (BJL, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 149 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Return To Sender/Unable to Forward. Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #143 Order to Show Cause. (BJL, )
August 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/27/2018. Telephone conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 148 JUDGMENT with accompanying #144 Order on Motion for Settlement. This action solely as to Plaintiff Brittany Joiner is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by John L. Medearis, CLERK OF COURT.(BJL, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 147 JUDGMENT with accompanying #146 Order. Defendant Ruby Tuesday's motion to dismiss Plaintiff John Werners claims with prejudice [Doc. #138 ] is GRANTED, and this action solely as to Plaintiff John Werner is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by John L. Medearis, CLERK OF COURT.(BJL,)*Mailed to John Werner.
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting #138 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff John-Phillip Werner ("Werner"). Werner's claim is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. AN APPROPRIATE JUDGMENT WILL ENTER.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/27/2018. (BJL, )*Mailed to John Werner. Modified on 8/27/2018 (BJL, ).
August 14, 2018 Filing 145 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Return To Sender/Refused/Unable To Forward. Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #142 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BJL, )
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement Against Plaintiff Brittany Joiner. This action solely as to Plaintiff Brittany Joiner is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/8/2018. (BJL, ) Modified on 8/8/2018 (BJL, ).*Mailed to John Werner.
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Accordingly, on or before 8/21/2018, Werner SHALL file a response to this Order to show cause as to why his case should not be dismissed with prejudice based upon his failure to prosecute or his failure to comply with an Order of the Court pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).1 Werner is FOREWARNED that any failure by him to file a timely response showing good cause will result in the dismissal of his action against Defendant with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/7/2018. (BJL, )Mailed to John Werner.
August 2, 2018 Filing 142 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (BJL, )*Mailed to John Phillip Werner
July 25, 2018 Filing 141 STIPULATION of Dismissal Party Brittany Joiner by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Certification of Counsel)(Van Remmen, Gordon)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER re #139 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement Against Plaintiff Brittany Joiner filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. 1. Plaintiff Brittany Joiner is required to submit the required IRS W-4 and IRS W-9 Forms within ten (10) days of this Order; and 2. Plaintiff Brittany Joiner is FOREWARNED that is she fails to meet this ten (10) day deadline, the Court will allow the entry of a joint stipulation that dismisses her claims with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. 3. Plaintiffs' counsel is required to timely provide this Order to Plaintiff Brittany Joiner and to submit proof of doing so in connection with any joint stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 7/11/2018. (BJL, )
July 9, 2018 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement Enforce Settlement Agreement Against Plaintiff Brittany Joiner by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebert, Melissa)
July 9, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff John Werner's Claims with Prejudice by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebert, Melissa)
July 6, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 7/6/2018. (Court Reporter No Court Reporter or No Courtroom Deputy present) (BJL, )
July 5, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for Friday 7/6/2018 02:00 PM (Eastern) before U.S. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. Counsel for the parties were previously provided via e-mail from Chambers with the call-in number and any necessary codes for participating in said telephonic conference call.(BJL,)
June 13, 2018 Filing 136 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Certification of Counsel (Lampros, Andrew)
June 11, 2018 Filing 135 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable-Return To Sender/Refused/Unable to Forward. Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #133 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (BJL, )
June 7, 2018 Filing 134 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Shannan Andrews of Motion Hearing before Judge Lee on 5-22-18. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge Lee on 5-22-18. By s/ Shannan Andrews. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (SIA, )
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting #122 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for John Phillip Werner. Attorney Lampros is DIRECTED to email an electronic copy of this order to Werner and the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a paper copy of this order to Werner at the address provided in the motion.2 Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/30/2018. (BJL, )Mailed to John Phillip Werner as directed by the Court.
May 29, 2018 Filing 132 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (BJL, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 131 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: mail sent to John Phillip Werner re 126 Order 127 Order and 128 Order. (BJL, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2018 re #122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to John Phillip Werner Only filed by Matthew Van Vorst, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Charlene Craig, Wesley Waldrop, Nathan Rogers. (Court Reporter Shannan Andrews) (CNC, )
May 21, 2018 Filing 129 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Phillip Werner re #123 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (BDG, )
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER finding as moot #100 Joint Motion for Revised Scheduling Order. [See Doc. 124]. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan) Modified on 5/11/2018 (BJL, ).Mailed to John Phillip Werner
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER finding as moot #98 Motion to Change Venue. [See Doc. 124]. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan) Modified on 5/11/2018 (BJL, ).Mailed to John Phillip Werner
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER finding as moot #90 Motion to Amend/Correct. [See Doc. 124]. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan) Modified on 5/11/2018 (BJL, ). Mailed to John Phillip Werner
May 10, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Counsel Compliance with May 9, 2018 Order (Doc. #123) (Lampros, Andrew)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #121 Motion for Settlement of Times Square Claimants by Charlene Craig. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/10/2018. (BJL,)Mailed to John Phillip Werner
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re #122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to John Phillip Werner Only : Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2018 02:30 PM Eastern in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/9/2018. (BJL, )Mailed to John Phillip Werner 48 West Chestnut Ave. Merchantville, NJ 08109.
May 7, 2018 Filing 122 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to John Phillip Werner Only by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
May 2, 2018 Filing 121 Joint MOTION for Settlement of Times Square Claimants by Charlene Craig. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Lampros, Andrew)
May 2, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Filing of Executed Claim Form by Amanda Zarfos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Form)(Lampros, Andrew)
April 20, 2018 Filing 119 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Rita Hermanny of Fairness Hearing before Judge Judge Lee on 4/19/18. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge Judge Lee on 4/19/18. By s/ Rita Hermanny. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (CNC, )
April 19, 2018 Filing 118 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Fairness Hearing held on 4/19/2018. (Court Reporter Rita Hermanny) (CNC, )
April 18, 2018 Filing 117 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Filing of Supplemental Affidavit of Dahl Administrators (Lampros, Andrew)
April 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2018. Conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
April 13, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE by Charlene Craig filing of Affidavit Regarding Notice (Lampros, Andrew)
February 15, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Filing of Ruby Tuesday Settlement Tax Documents by John Werner (JBR)
December 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Fairing Hearing set for 4/19/2018 03:00 PM (Eastern) in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. (BJL,) Modified on 12/22/2017 (BJL, ).
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING CLASS SETTLEMENT: The Court will hold a Fairness Hearing to consider the fairness, reasonableness,and adequacy of the proposed settlement on April 19, 2018 at 3:00 p.m., [EASTERN], at the Joel W. Solomon Federal Building, U.S. Courthouse, 900 Georgia Avenue, Chattanooga, Tennessee 37402. During the Fairness Hearing, the Court will consider whether the proposed settlement described in the Agreement should be approved as fair, reasonable, and adequate, and whether the Court should enter the proposed Final Order and Judgment approving the proposed settlement and dismissing this Action on the merits, with prejudice. Upon a showing of good cause, the Court may extend any of the deadlines set forth in this Order without further notice to the Settlement Class.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/22/2017. (BJL, )
December 20, 2017 Filing 113 Unopposed MOTION for Settlement for Preliminary Approval and Certification for Settlement Purposes Only by Charlene Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Stipulation of Settlement and accompanying documents, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Lampros, #3 Other Proposed Order)(Lampros, Andrew)
December 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2017. Telephone conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
December 1, 2017 Filing 112 COURT REPORTER NOTES OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Shannan Andrews of Settlement Approval Hearing before Judge Lee on 11-21-17. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of TN before Judge Lee on 11-21-17. By s/ Shannan Andrews. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only). (SIA, )
November 21, 2017 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Settlement Approval Hearing held on 11/21/2017. (Court Reporter Shannan Andrews) (CNC, ) (Main Document 111 replaced on 11/22/2017) (CNC, ).
November 10, 2017 Filing 110 Unopposed MOTION Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Lampros, Andrew)
November 3, 2017 Filing 109 TEXT ORDER granting #108 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Upon the consent motion of the Parties to extend time, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs have through November 10, 2017 in which to file their Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
November 3, 2017 Filing 108 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Preliminary Approval by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Lampros, Andrew)
October 24, 2017 Filing 107 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Charlene Craig, Wesley Waldrop, Matthew Van Vorst, Christopher Genther, Nathan Rogers, Stephanie Onderchanin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Forms)(Lampros, Andrew)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 11/21/2017 04:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/24/2017. (BJL, )
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #104 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs SHALL file the amended complaint within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/24/2017. (BJL, )
October 20, 2017 Filing 104 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Revise Complaint by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Zarfos Consent)(Van Remmen, Gordon)
October 17, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Status Conference held on 10/17/2017. Status conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (Court Reporter DCR4) (CNC, )
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/17/2017 10:00 AM Eastern in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/13/2017. (BJL, )
September 8, 2017 Filing 102 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop Case Reported Settled By Plaintiffs; Parties participated in mediation/arbitration. (Lampros, Andrew)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER TO STAY PENDING ARBITRATION: it is hereby ORDERED that all Court proceedings as to the Arbitration Plaintiffs listed herein are stayed, and the Arbitration Plaintiffs' claims in this lawsuit are referred to arbitration with AAA. As the individual arbitrations are resolved or concluded, the parties are to file a stipulation of dismissal within fifteen (15) days of conclusion in arbitration. The Parties shall file a status report regarding pending individual arbitration claims every six months from the entry date of this Order until all of the claims of the Arbitration Plaintiffs are dismissed by stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/7/2017. (BJL, )
August 30, 2017 Filing 100 Joint MOTION entry for revised scheduling order by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Revised Scheduling Order)(Siebert, Melissa)
August 28, 2017 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Scheduling Conference held on 8/28/2017. (DCR 4) (aws, )
August 25, 2017 Filing 98 MOTION to Change Venue Transfer as to Times Square Plaintiffs by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Other Memorandum of Law)(Lampros, Andrew)
August 25, 2017 Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Stay As to Certain Plaintiffs Pending Arbitration by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
August 24, 2017 Filing 96 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/24/17. (JBR)
August 23, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a Magistrate Judge by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Siebert, Melissa)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Motion Hearing is RESET for 8/28/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/15/2017. (BJL, )
August 11, 2017 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2017 re #90 Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., ( telephone Conference set for 8/28/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee.). (Court Reporter DCR4) (CNC, )
August 7, 2017 Filing 92 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #90 Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee. (KRS, )
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #90 Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/1/17. (JBR)
July 31, 2017 Filing 90 Joint MOTION to Amend/Revise Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Siebert, Melissa)
July 6, 2017 Filing 89 REPORT of Mediation (Harwell, Marc)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: For good cause shown, the Parties motions [Docs. #84 , #85 & #86 ] for anextension of the stay of all proceedings and postponement of all deadlines pending settlement negotiations are GRANTED and the stay shall be extended to July 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/4/2017. (BJL, )
May 4, 2017 Filing 87 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
May 2, 2017 Filing 86 Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, MOTION for Discovery by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Harwell, Marc)
May 2, 2017 Filing 85 MOTION to Stay (to continue stay) by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Lampros, Andrew)
April 26, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Status Conference held on 4/26/2017. Conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
April 25, 2017 Filing 84 MOTION to Stay re #76 Order on Motion to Stay, Motion to Extend Stay by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Harwell, Marc)
April 11, 2017 Filing 83 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop (Lampros, Andrew)
March 20, 2017 Filing 82 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
March 13, 2017 Filing 81 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
February 27, 2017 Filing 80 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
February 20, 2017 Filing 79 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
February 13, 2017 Filing 78 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
February 7, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Lampros, Andrew)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Stay and for status Conference. A status conference with the undersigned will take place by telephone on April 26, 2017 at 11:00 a.m. [EASTERN]. One attorney from each firm that has made an appearance on behalf of any party is REQUIRED to participate in the telephonic status conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/2/2017. (BJL, ) Modified on 2/3/2017 (BJL, ). Mailed to Attorney Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen , II
February 2, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 2/2/2017. Telephone conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: For good cause shown, and upon agreement of the parties, the Joint Motion To Withdraw Motion To Compel Arbitration and Opposition to Motion To Compel Arbitration [Doc. #72 ] is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to remove defendant's motion to dismiss and compel arbitration [Doc. 46 ], defendant's memorandum in support of its motion [Doc. 47 ], plaintiffs' opposition [Doc. #53 ], and defendant's reply to response to motion [Doc. 56 ] from the electronic filing system. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/31/17. (JBR) Modified on 2/1/2017 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorney Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen , II.
January 31, 2017 Filing 74 NOTICE of Hearing: A telephone conference is set for 2/2/2017 02:30 PM [EASTERN] before U.S. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee.(BJL, )
January 30, 2017 Filing 73 Joint MOTION to Stay and for Settlement Conference by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
January 30, 2017 Filing 72 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #53 Response in Opposition to Motion, 47 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 56 Reply to Response to Motion, 46 MOTION to Dismiss Lead Plaintiff Charlene Craig's Claims in Amended Complaint by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
January 26, 2017 Filing 71 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Certain Opt-in Plaintiffs Only by All Plaintiffs. (Lampros, Andrew)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gordon Van Remmen on behalf of Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, and Wesley Waldrop. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 01/23/2017. (KRS, ) Modified on 1/23/2017 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorney Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen , II.
January 20, 2017 Filing 69 STIPULATION (Corrected) Joint Stipulation of the Parties by All Plaintiffs. (Lampros, Andrew)
January 20, 2017 Filing 68 *See document #69 for corrected stipulation* STIPULATION Joint Stipulation of the Parties by All Plaintiffs. (Lampros, Andrew) Modified on 1/23/2017 (BJL, ).
January 18, 2017 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Attorney Gordon Van Remmen, filed by Plaintiffs. *Attorney has application for admission pending therefore no USDC Certificate of Good Standing is required. (BJL, )
January 17, 2017 Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal Certain Opt-In Plaintiffs by Charlene Craig. (Lampros, Andrew)
January 3, 2017 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice-Attorney Gordon Van Remmen by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (DJH, ) Modified on 1/18/2017 (BJL, ).
December 9, 2016 Filing 65 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/9/16. (JBR)
December 6, 2016 Filing 64 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Agreed Protective Order) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit/Attachment A - Acknowledgment and Agreement to be Bound, #2 Other Proposed Agreed Protective Order)(Harwell, Marc)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER the Court ORDERS the following schedule: 1. The parties are DIRECTED to confer in good faith by no later than January 6, 2017 to determine if they can jointly submit a proposed agreed order concerning the issue of conditional certification (and related issues concerning the language of the notice and opt-in form and scheduling. Any such proposed agreed order SHALL be properly filed no later than January 20, 2017. 2. If the parties are unable to reach agreement to submit a proposed agreed conditional certification order, then: a. Plaintiffs SHALL file any motion for conditional certification (including their proposed court-approved notice, opt-in consent form, opt-in time period, and related items) on or before January 31, 2017; b. Defendant SHALL file its response (including (i) any arguments in opposition to conditional certification and (ii) alternatively assuming the motion is granted, its proposed revisions, if any, to the language, timing and form of Plaintiffs' proposed notice, opt-in consent form, opt-in time period, and related items) on or before March 2, 2017; and c. Plaintiffs SHALL file a reply, if any, on or before March 17, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/29/2016. (BJL, )
November 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 11/23/2016. Telephone conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC, )
November 18, 2016 Filing 62 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. Amendment to #37 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, #59 Order [Plaintiffs' Proposed] Amended Discovery Plan. (Lampros, Andrew)
November 18, 2016 Filing 61 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. Proposed Amended Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. (Harwell, Marc)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER: The Court has now entered the agreed discovery order [Doc. #59 ]. Accordingly, Defendant's motion for protective order [Doc. #49 ] is DENIED AS MOOT, and Plaintiffs' Stipulation [Doc. #54 ] is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/17/2016. (BJL, )
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AGREED DISCOVERY ORDER: The parties will submit a revised discovery plan to the Court on or before November 18, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/17/2016. (BJL, )
November 16, 2016 Filing 58 Joint MOTION for Discovery Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)(Siebert, Melissa)
November 4, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 11/4/2016. Conference held in chambers without a courtroom deputy or court reporter. (CNC, )
November 3, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Siebert, Melissa)
November 3, 2016 Filing 56 [Document removed from ECF per #75 Order] REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Lead Plaintiff Charlene Craig's Claims in Amended Complaint filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Siebert, Melissa) Modified event on 1/31/2017 (JBR).
October 31, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Harwell, Marc)
October 27, 2016 Filing 54 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (Lampros, Andrew) Modified on 11/18/2016 (BJL, ).*STRICKEN PER #60 ORDER.
October 24, 2016 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Lead Plaintiff Charlene Craig's Claims in Amended Complaint filed by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
October 24, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - letter)(Lampros, Andrew)
October 20, 2016 Filing 51 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop Request for Leave of Absence for Andrew Lampros (Lampros, Andrew)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 10/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL, )
October 7, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION for Protective Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Siebert, Melissa)
October 7, 2016 Filing 48 ANSWER to #26 Amended Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Ruby Tuesday, Inc..(Siebert, Melissa)
October 7, 2016 Filing 47 [Document removed from ECF per #75 Order] MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re 46 MOTION to Dismiss Lead Plaintiff Charlene Craig's Claims in Amended Complaint filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Siebert, Melissa) Modified event on 1/31/2017 (JBR).
October 7, 2016 Filing 46 [Document removed from ECF per #75 Order] MOTION to Dismiss Lead Plaintiff Charlene Craig's Claims in Amended Complaint by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Siebert, Melissa) Modified event on 1/31/2017 (JBR).
October 7, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc H Harwell on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Harwell, Marc)
October 4, 2016 Filing 44 NOTICE by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Attachments: #1 Other Signed Consents)(Lampros, Andrew)
September 23, 2016 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #21 ] is DENIED as moot, Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [Doc. #33 ] is DENIED, and Defendant's Motion for Protective Order and to Extend Pretrial and Trial Dates [Doc. #40 ] is DENIED as moot. Defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from the entry of this Order in which to file a response to the amended complaint [Doc. #26 ]. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/23/16. (JBR)
September 21, 2016 Filing 42 SUPPLEMENT to #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, #32 Response in Opposition to Motion, Supplemental Authority Per Local Rule 7.1(d) by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
September 7, 2016 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #40 MOTION for Protective Order and to Extend Pretrial and Trial Dates filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keane, Bonnie)
September 7, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION for Protective Order and to Extend Pretrial and Trial Dates by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Keane, Bonnie)
August 25, 2016 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference held on 8/25/2016 in chambers. Court reporter and courtroom deputy not present. (aws, )
August 2, 2016 Filing 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Telephone Conference in chambers held on 8/2/2016. Court reporter and courtroom deputy not present. (aws, )
July 11, 2016 Filing 37 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lampros, Andrew)
June 20, 2016 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 MOTION to Strike #30 Notice (Other) and Plaintiff's Response #32 filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Siebert, Melissa)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/16/16. (JBR)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/13/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/6/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/16/16. (JBR)
June 10, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Strike #30 RESPONSE by Charlene Craig. (Lampros, Andrew) Modified on 6/13/2016 (BJL, ).
June 9, 2016 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss referenced in Defendant's Response to Amended Complaint filed by Charlene Craig, Christopher Genther, Stephanie Onderchanin, Nathan Rogers, Matthew Van Vorst, Wesley Waldrop. (Lampros, Andrew)
May 23, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (Siebert, Melissa)
May 23, 2016 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. re #26 Amended Complaint Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Siebert, Melissa) Modified on 6/13/2016 (BJL, ).
May 16, 2016 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Reply in Further Support of filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Siebert, Melissa)
May 10, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Filing of Consents to Opt In (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consents)(Lampros, Andrew)
May 6, 2016 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charlene Craig. (Lampros, Andrew)
May 6, 2016 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc.., filed by Charlene Craig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Consents)(Lampros, Andrew)
April 28, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Withdrawal by Caitlin Duffy, Esq. (Trief, Ted)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 4/13/2016. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL, ) Modified on 4/13/2016 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorneys Trief, Friedland, Duffy, and Gutgarts.
April 12, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Keane, Bonnie)
April 12, 2016 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration)(Keane, Bonnie)
April 12, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (Keane, Bonnie)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joel Griswold to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/11/2016. (KRS, )
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Melissa A. Siebert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/11/2016. (KRS, )
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bonnie LuAnn Keane on behalf of Ruby Tuesday, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/11/2016. (KRS, )
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanislav Gutgarts to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charlene Craig. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/11/2016. (KRS, )
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shelly L. Friedland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charlene Craig. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/11/2016. (KRS, )
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ted Trief to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Charlene Craig. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/RegistrationForm.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 04/11/2016. (KRS, )
April 11, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Consent (Lampros, Andrew)
April 8, 2016 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding documents: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vic filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc., #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (BJL, )
April 7, 2016 (Filing fee: $ 270.00, receipt number C1013445 for Pro hac vice motions docs #11 , #12 , and #13 ) (BJL)
April 7, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Joel Griswold to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00, C1013445) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (BJL, )
April 7, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Melissa A. Siebert to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00, C1013445) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (BJL, )
April 7, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Bonnie LuAnn Keane to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00, C1013445) by Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (BJL, )
April 6, 2016 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Charlene Craig, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Charlene Craig, #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Charlene Craig . (BJL, )
April 6, 2016 (Filing fee: $ 270.00, receipt number C1013436 for Pro hac vice motions docs #8 , #9 , and #10 .) (BJL, ) Modified to correct receipt amount on 4/8/2016 (BJL, ).
April 6, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to for Attorney Stanislav Gutgarts to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00, receipt# C1013436) by Charlene Craig. (BJL, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Shelly L. Friedland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00, receipt # C101346) by Charlene Craig. (BJL, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Ted Trief to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.00, # C1013436) by Charlene Craig. (BJL, )
April 4, 2016 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlene Craig. Ruby Tuesday, Inc. served on 4/1/2016. (Lampros, Andrew)
March 31, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE by Charlene Craig of Consent to be Party Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration and Consent)(Lampros, Andrew)
March 31, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Attorney Shelly L. Friedland (Pro Hac. Mailed to Shelly L. Friedland. (BDG, )
March 31, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Attorney Caitlin Duffy (Pro Hac). Mailed to Caitlin Duffy. (BDG, )
March 31, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency as to Attorney Ted E. Trief (Pro Hac) (BDG, ) Modified on 3/31/2016 to correct docket text (BDG, ). Mailed to Ted E. Trief.
March 31, 2016 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ruby Tuesday, Inc.. (BDG, )
March 31, 2016 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG, )
March 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruby Tuesday, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3070753.), filed by Charlene Craig. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Lampros, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Waldrop
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Represented By: Stanislav Gutgarts
Represented By: Christopher B Hall
Represented By: Shelly L. Friedland
Represented By: Ted E. Trief
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Phillip Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Rogers
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Represented By: Stanislav Gutgarts
Represented By: Christopher B Hall
Represented By: Shelly L. Friedland
Represented By: Ted E. Trief
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Genther
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Represented By: Stanislav Gutgarts
Represented By: Christopher B Hall
Represented By: Shelly L. Friedland
Represented By: Ted E. Trief
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Craig
Represented By: Caitlin Duffy
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Represented By: Stanislav Gutgarts
Represented By: Christopher B Hall
Represented By: Shelly L. Friedland
Represented By: Ted E. Trief
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Onderchanin
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Represented By: Stanislav Gutgarts
Represented By: Christopher B Hall
Represented By: Shelly L. Friedland
Represented By: Ted E. Trief
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Van Vorst
Represented By: Gordon Gerhard Van Remmen, II
Represented By: Stanislav Gutgarts
Represented By: Christopher B Hall
Represented By: Shelly L. Friedland
Represented By: Ted E. Trief
Represented By: Andrew Lampros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc. (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Tuesday, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Christopher Griswold
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Represented By: Melissa A Siebert
Represented By: Marc H Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?