Armstrong v. The United States of America (TWP2)

Plaintiff: Charles H. Armstrong, Jr.
Defendant: The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00163
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
0 Judge: Thomas W Phillips
1 Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
September 14, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The United States of America.(Bishop, Kyle)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-6-18. (KMG, )
August 3, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3733843.) filed by Charles H. Armstrong, Jr. (AML, )
August 2, 2018 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3733843.) by Charles H. Armstrong, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Raanon, Gal)
July 25, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Lamar Bishop on behalf of The United States of America (Bishop, Kyle)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/20/2018. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney John Sawyer
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/20/2018. (BJL,)*Mailed to Attorney John Sawyer
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 7/20/2018. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney John Sawyer
July 20, 2018 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Attorneys Gal Raanon and John Sawyer. (BJL, )*Mailed to Attorney John Sawyer.
July 20, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to The United States of America. (BJL, )
July 20, 2018 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL, )
July 20, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Abatement of Penalties and Refund against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3722931.), filed by Charles H. Armstrong, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Raanon, Gal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. The United States of America (TWP2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles H. Armstrong, Jr.
Represented By: John C Sawyer
Represented By: Gal Raanon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Kyle Lamar Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?