Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority v. Green Acres West, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority
Defendant: Green Acres West, LLC, Meade G Stone, III, Company Manager, LLC, Green Acres South, LLC and Entity Manager, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00235
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/2018. (MRE, )
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent\Non-Consent) (BDG, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Company Manager, LLC, Entity Manager, LLC, Green Acres South, LLC, Green Acres West, LLC, Meade G Stone, III.(Horton, William)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Exension of TIme for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Hollis, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Meade G. Stone, III on 10/5/2018, filed by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Hollis, James)
October 17, 2018 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Civil Case Coversheet by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Southerland, Mary)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 SECOND Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 Supplement : requirements due by 10/22/2018. (BDG, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James L. Hollis on behalf of Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/10/2018. (KRS, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard E. Glaze, Jr. on behalf of Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/10/2018. (KRS, ) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BDG, ). Order mailed to Glaze.
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/3/2018. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/3/2018. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/3/2018. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice to Counsel #2 Supplement :Attorney signature and Nature of Suit missing on Civil Cover sheet. Please refile corrected Civil Cover sheet. Requirements due by 10/9/2018. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Company Manager, LLC, Entity Manager, LLC, Green Acres South, LLC, Green Acres West, LLC, Meade G Stone, III. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James L. Hollis (Balch & Bingham, LLP) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3783505.) filed by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority as to Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (BDG, )
October 3, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rich Glaze (Balch & Bingham, LLP) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3783495.) filed by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority as to Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (BDG, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James L. Hollis (Balch & Bingham, LLP) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3783505.) by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Southerland, Mary)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rich Glaze (Balch & Bingham, LLP) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3783495.) by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Southerland, Mary)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Subpoenas by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Subpoena - Entity Manager, #2 Supplement Subpoena - Green Acres South, #3 Supplement Subpoena - Green Acres West, #4 Supplement Subpoena - Meade Stone)(Southerland, Mary)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT - Civil Case Coversheet by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Southerland, Mary)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3783441.), filed by Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - WWTA Rules & Regulations, #2 Exhibit B - Flow Study, #3 Exhibit C - Transmittal Letter to Green Acres re Flow Study)(Southerland, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority v. Green Acres West, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Acres West, LLC
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meade G Stone, III
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company Manager, LLC
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Acres South, LLC
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entity Manager, LLC
Represented By: William H Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton County Water and Wastewater Treatment Authority
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Represented By: Richard E. Glaze, Jr.
Represented By: James L Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?