Hooker v. Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC
Plaintiff: Laura J Hooker
Defendant: Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00237
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/8/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger.Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/30/2018. (SAC, ) Modified on 11/30/2018, mailed to Attorney Henshaw. (SAC, ).
November 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger: Scheduling Conference held in chambers w/o courtroom deputy on 11/29/2018. (KFB, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 Administrative Notice to Counsel Henshaw, requirements due by 12/4/2018. (SAC, ) Modified on 11/29/2018, mailed to Attorney Henshaw. (SAC, ).
November 29, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance for Timothy Henshaw on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burks, G) Modified on 11/29/2018 (SAC, ).
November 26, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Frost, Michael)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/18 is RESCHEDULED for 11/29/2018 04:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG, )
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2018 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG, )
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 11/05/2018. (AMP)
November 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC (Frost, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiffs' counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/15/2018. (AMP)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Non-Consent/Consent Form) (SAC, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 INFORMATIONAL ONLY -Administrative Notice to Counsel #9 Answer to Complaint. (SAC, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC.(Frost, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Christopher H. Steger, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on October 10, 2018. (AYB).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/10/2018. (KRS, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wacker Chemical Corporation for Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC. (Frost, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/09/2018. (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/09/2018. (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 10/09/2018. (AMP)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed separate using the event Certificate of Corporate Interest under Other Documents. Requirements due by 10/15/2018. (AMP)
October 9, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley County Circuit Court, case number V18501. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3787532), filed by Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pleadings filed in State Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - index of pleadings filed in State Court, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Frost, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooker v. Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura J Hooker
Represented By: Timothy O Henshaw
Represented By: G Brent Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wacker Polysilicon North America, LLC
Represented By: Michael Heith Frost
Represented By: Kyle W Eiselstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?