Lancaster et al v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Labron Lancaster and Lawanda Lancaster
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. and Medtronic USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00244
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Confidentiality Stipulation and Protective Order)(Shockley, Gary)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order. Any deadlines or dates not listed below will remain in place, while the following deadlines are hereby RESET (as set forth in the order herein).Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/27/2019. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Pre-Trial Deadlines re #15 Scheduling Order, (Unopposed) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Agreed ORDER For Medical Records granting #23 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 7/22/2019. (BJL)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records (proposed order submitted) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Shockley, Gary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 Administrative Notice to Counsel #21 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records :Orders not agreed to by all parties should NOT be included as an attachment to a motion or other request for relief. Please refer to ECF rules to make necessary corrections. (BDG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Agreed Order for Medical Records by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Proposed Agreed Order for Medical Records)(Shockley, Gary)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kayla A. Brewe on behalf of Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 05/01/2019. (KRS) Modified on 5/2/2019 (BJL).* Mailed to Attorney Kayla A. Brewe.
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Bryan T. Pratt on behalf of Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 05/01/2019. (KRS) Modified on 5/2/2019 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Bryan T. Pratt.
April 25, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Bryan T. Pratt) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3955900.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kayla A. Brewe) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3955903.) filed by Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc. (BJL, )
April 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kayla A. Brewe) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3955903.) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shockley, Gary)
April 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Bryan T. Pratt) ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3955900.) by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other - Certificate of Good Standing)(Shockley, Gary)
January 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT to Magistrate by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Shockley, Gary)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/9/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2020 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/10/2018. (BJL, )
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non Consent) (BJL, )
December 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2018. ( No Court Reporter/No Courtroom Deputy present) (BJL, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Shockley, Gary)
November 27, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint & Affirmative Defenses by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc..(Busey, Zachary)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/4/2018, at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 11/13/2018. (CMH)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Lawanda Lancaster, Johnny Labron Lancaster.(Berke, Marvin)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint & Affirmative Defenses by Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc..(Busey, Zachary)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin V. Wallin on behalf of Plaintiffs Johnny Labron Lancaster, Lawanda Lancaster. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/16/2018. (KRS, ) Modified on 10/16/2018 (BJL,).*Mailed to Attorney Erin V. Wallin.
October 15, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Wallin, filed by Lawanda Lancaster, Johnny Labron Lancaster (BJL, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Medtronic PLC to Medtronic, Inc. Role - dft
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medtronic USA, Inc.. (Busey, Zachary) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Medtronic PLC to Medtronic USA, Inc. Role - dft
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erin Wallin, by Johnny Labron Lancaster, Lawanda Lancaster. (Berke, Marvin) Modified on 10/15/2018 (BJL, ).
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, )
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/12/18. (aws, )
October 12, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (aws, )
October 12, 2018 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (aws, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3792053), filed by Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Busey, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster et al v. Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Kayla A Brewe
Represented By: Bryan T. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Sofamor Danek USA, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Kayla A Brewe
Represented By: Bryan T. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic USA, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Gary C Shockley
Represented By: Kayla A Brewe
Represented By: Bryan T. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Labron Lancaster
Represented By: Marvin B Berke
Represented By: Erin V Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawanda Lancaster
Represented By: Marvin B Berke
Represented By: Erin V Wallin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?