Sprouse et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al (TWP2)

Plaintiff: David G Sprouse and Judy K Sprouse
Defendant: Wilson & Associates, PLLC and Ditech Financial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00260
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by David G Sprouse, Judy K Sprouse. (Attachments: #1 Other Unpublished case)(Chancey, H)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wright, Heather)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wilson & Associates, PLLC. (Morgan, Gerald)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wilson & Associates, PLLC. (Morgan, Gerald)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/12/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/22/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas W Phillips.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 11/19/18. (ABF)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Ditech Financial, LLC.(Wright, Heather)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Ditech Financial, LLC (Wright, Heather)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 11/5/18. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (aws, ) Modified on 11/5/2018 Mailed to Jerry Morgan. (aws, )
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wilson & Associates, PLLC. (Morgan, Gerald)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Morgan on behalf of Wilson & Associates, PLLC (Morgan, Gerald)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 11/1/18. (c/m to Jerry D. Morgan) (ABF)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 11/1/18. (ABF) Modified on 11/1/2018 to indicate c/m to Jerry D. Morgan (ABF).
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 11/1/18. (c/m to Jerry D. Morgan) (ABF)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Jerry D. Morgan: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (c/m to Jerry D. Morgan) (ABF)
October 31, 2018 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (ABF)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Chancery Court, case number 18-0607. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3807566), filed by Ditech Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hamilton Chancery Court Pleadings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wright, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sprouse et al v. Ditech Financial, LLC et al (TWP2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates, PLLC
Represented By: Jerry D Morgan
Represented By: Gerald Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Heather Howell Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David G Sprouse
Represented By: H Franklin Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy K Sprouse
Represented By: H Franklin Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?