Smith v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al (TV2)

Plaintiff: Donna Smith
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon Retail, LLC, Amazon.com.dedc, LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc. and Amazon.com DEDC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00276
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc. (Mackler, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 SECOND Administrative Notice to Counsel #12 Answer to Complaint :Please file certificate of service. i.e. Civil Events, Initial Pleadings andService, Service of Process, Certificate of Service requirements due by 12/26/2018. (BDG, )
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney R. Sadler Bailey on behalf of Plaintiff by Donna Smith. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/14/2018. (KRS, )
December 10, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90.) filed by Donna Smith as to Donna Smith. (BDG, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90. receipt number C1016217) by Donna Smith. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(BDG, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Josh Cannon terminated. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(BDG, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 Administrative Notice to Counsel #12 Answer to Complaint :Please file certificate of service. i.e. Civil Events,Initial Pleadings andService,Service of Process,Certificate of Service. requirements due by 12/11/2018. (BDG, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com, Inc. for Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.. (Mackler, James)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc..(Mackler, James)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James E. Mackler on behalf of Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/20/2018. (KRS, ) Modified on 11/21/2018 (BDG, ). Order mailed to Mackler.
November 19, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc. as to Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc. (BDG, )
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.. (BDG, )
November 16, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon Retail, LLC, Amazon.com DEDC, LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.. Amendment to #2 NOTICE of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Revised Civil Cover Sheet. (Wolfe, Joshua)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Josh Cannon and James Mackler) (CAT) Modified to reflect copy of Order mailed to both addresses listed for attorney James E. Mackler on 11/16/2018 (CAT).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed to Josh Cannon and James Mackler) (CAT) Modified to reflect copy of Order mailed to both addresses listed for attorney James E. Mackler on 11/16/2018 (CAT).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/16/2018. (Copy of Order mailed Josh Cannon and James Mackler) (CAT) Modified to reflect copy of Order mailed to both addresses listed for attorney James E. Mackler on 11/16/2018 (CAT).
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney James E. Mackler is not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to James E. Mackler) (CAT) Modified to reflect copy of Notice mailed to both addresses listed for attorney James E. Mackler on 11/16/2018 (CAT).
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney R. Sadler Bailey is not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (CAT)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney Josh Cannon is not admitted. This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. (Copy of Notice mailed to Josh Cannon) (CAT)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Please refile Civil Cover Sheet. Requirements due by 11/21/2018. (CAT)
November 16, 2018 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon Retail, LLC, Amazon.com DEDC, LLC, Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. (CAT)
November 16, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 18C997. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3817709), filed by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon Logistics, Inc., Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Amazon.com.dedc, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc., Amazon Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Pleadings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: James E Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: James E Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: James E Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Retail, LLC
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: James E Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com.dedc, LLC
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: James E Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com DEDC, LLC
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Represented By: James E Mackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Smith
Represented By: R. Sadler Bailey
Represented By: Josh Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?