Tennessee Valley Authority v. Vantiegham et al
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Defendant: Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham and A TEMPORARY RIGHT TO ENTER UPON LAND IN MEIGS COUNTY, TENNESSEE
Case Number: 1:2018cv00282
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/14/2019. (AML, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 18 LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TVA letters to landowners (redacted))(Chase, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority re #16 Certificate of Service, #15 Certificate of Service of Completion of Service of Pleadings upon all Defendants as of January 3, 2019 (Chase, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Bridget Vantiegham (Chase, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America John Vantiegham (Chase, James)
December 26, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Project Description, #2 Exhibit Map)(Chase, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham. (Townsend, C)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by C Crews Townsend on behalf of Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham (Townsend, C)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF POSSESSION. Defendants are ORDERED to immediately comply with this Order and to surrender possession of said real property to TVA pending further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/6/2018. (AML, )
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137, it is hereby ORDERED that the above referenced case is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry S. Mattice, Jr., United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 12/4/18. (ABF)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
November 26, 2018 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to A Temporary Right to Enter Upon Land in Meigs County, Tennessee, Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham.. (AML, )
November 26, 2018 Filing 8 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #7 Memorandum in Support (non-motion) : requirements due by 12/3/2018. (AML, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Chase, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Chase, James)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 21, 2018. (RLK)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 21, 2018. (RLK)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on November 20, 2018. (RLK)
November 20, 2018 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (RLK)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority Notice of Tendering Deposit (Chase, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A TEMPORARY RIGHT TO ENTER UPON LAND IN MEIGS COUNTY, TENNESSEE, Bridget Vantiegham, John Vantiegham, filed by United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Taking, #3 Aerial Photograph, #4 Notice of Condemnation)(Chase, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tennessee Valley Authority v. Vantiegham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Vantiegham
Represented By: Michael Heith Frost
Represented By: Roger W Dickson
Represented By: C Crews Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vantiegham
Represented By: Michael Heith Frost
Represented By: Roger W Dickson
Represented By: C Crews Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A TEMPORARY RIGHT TO ENTER UPON LAND IN MEIGS COUNTY, TENNESSEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America upon the relation and for the use of the Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By: James S Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?