Petty et al v. Monsanto Company (PLR1)

Plaintiff: Sharon Petty and Patrick A. Petty
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00293
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 MDL ORDER CTO-115 transferring the case to the ND/CA pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 (KMK, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick A. Petty, Sharon Petty. Monsanto Company served on 12/12/2018 through the Tennessee Secretary of State. (Attachments: #1 Other Return Receipt) (AYB)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tim L. Bowden on behalf of Plaintiffs Patrick A. Petty and Sharon Petty. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 12/07/2018. (KRS, ) Regenerated and emailed to Attorney Bowden
December 6, 2018 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (AML, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 90 paid, receipt No. 1016207). (AML, )
December 3, 2018 Documents 4,5,6 mailed to Attorney Tim Bowden. (AML, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/2018. (AML, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/2018. (AML, )
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/3/2018. (AML, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) mailed to Attorney Tim Bowden. Registration deadline 12/21/2018 (AML, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (AML, ) Mailed to Tim Bowden
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400 paid, Receipt No. C1016186), filed by Patrick A. Petty, Sharon Petty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(AML, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petty et al v. Monsanto Company (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Petty
Represented By: Tim L. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick A. Petty
Represented By: Tim L. Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?