Wilson v. Summit Tree Stands, Inc. (TV1)

Plaintiff: Melissa Wilson
Defendant: Summit Tree Stands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00294
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger on 01/30/2019. (BRS)
January 29, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellisse S. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3876342.) filed by Summit Tree Stands, Inc. (BJL, )
January 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ellisse S. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3876342.) by Summit Tree Stands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Bowman, Robert)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 01/22/2019. (BRS, ) Modified on 1/23/2019 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorney Phillip Reed Martens.
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 01/22/2019. (BRS, ) Modified on 1/23/2019 (BJL, ).*Mailed to Attorney Timothy W. Monsees.
January 18, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phillip Reed Martens filed by Melissa Wilson, #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy W. Monsees filed by Melissa Wilson as to Melissa Wilson (BJL, )
January 17, 2019 Clerification-RECEIPT No. C1016313 is for a total $180.00 for motions for pro hav vice Doc Nos. #15 and #16 . (BJL, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Phillip Reed Martens (Filing fee $ 90.00, Receipt No. C1016313) by Melissa Wilson. (BJL, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy W. Monsees (Filing fee $ 90.00, Receipt No. C1016313) by Melissa Wilson. (BJL, ) Modified Attorney's name on 1/18/2019 (BJL, ).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger on 01/17/2019. (BRS)
January 16, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry B. Sutton ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3864586.) filed by Summit Tree Stands, Inc. (BJL, )
January 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry B. Sutton ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3864586.) by Summit Tree Stands, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Bowman, Robert)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) for Attorneys Barry Brys Sutton and Ellisse S. Thompson. (BJL, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 1/7/2019. (BJL, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2019: #1 Other Notice of Consent/ Non Consent) (BJL, ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Summit Tree Stands, Inc.. (Bowman, Robert) Modified on 1/7/2019 (BJL, ).Added Corporate Affiliate - Summit Treestands, LLC to Summit Tree Stands, Inc. Role - dft.
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Summit Tree Stands, Inc..(Bowman, Robert)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Summit Tree Stands, Inc.. (BJL, )
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Layne Morrow on behalf of Summit Tree Stands, Inc. (Morrow, Brandon)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L Bowman on behalf of Summit Tree Stands, Inc. (Bowman, Robert)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint by Certified Mail, RRR served on RA - J. David Walker on 12/14/2018, filed by Melissa Wilson. (Thompson, Robert)
December 17, 2018 Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL, )
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to 1:17-cv-342-TAV-CHS. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan, and Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 12/17/2018. (Steger, Christopher)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Summit Tree Stands, Inc.. (BJL, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT-(completed) Civil Cover Sheet to #1 Complaint by Melissa Wilson. (Thompson, Robert) Modified on 12/7/2018 (BJL, ).
December 4, 2018 An email has been sent to Judge Steger's chambers to determine if case is related to 1:17-cv-342-TAV-CHS. (BJL, )
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint : requirements due by 12/4/2018. *Please file a completed Civil Cover Sheet form.(BJL, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Summit Tree Stands, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3831178.), filed by Melissa Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Thompson, Robert) Modified on 12/4/2018 (BJL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Summit Tree Stands, Inc. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Tree Stands, Inc.
Represented By: Ellisse S Thompson
Represented By: Barry Brys Sutton
Represented By: Brandon Layne Morrow
Represented By: Robert L Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Wilson
Represented By: Robert S Thompson
Represented By: Timothy W Monsees
Represented By: Phillip Reed Martens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?