Gulett et al v. Belk Department Stores, LP et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Gulett and Debbie Gulett
Defendant: Belk, Inc. and Belk Department Stores, LP
Case Number: 1:2018cv00312
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT TO MAGISTRATE by Belk, Inc. (Martin, Sean)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/14/2019 at 4:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Belk Department Stores, LP.(Martin, Sean)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna J Mikel on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mikel, Donna)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank P Pinchak on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Pinchak, Frank)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. (Miller, Chancey)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on December 26, 2018. (RLK)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on December 26, 2018. (RLK)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on December 26, 2018. (RLK)
December 26, 2018 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (RLK)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Belk Department Stores, LP, Belk, Inc.. (Martin, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hamilton County, case number 18C1295. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3845462), filed by Belk, Inc., Belk Department Stores, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint - redacted, #2 Criminal Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulett et al v. Belk Department Stores, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belk, Inc.
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Chancey Randall Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belk Department Stores, LP
Represented By: Sean W Martin
Represented By: Chancey Randall Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Gulett
Represented By: Michael A Wagner
Represented By: Donna J Mikel
Represented By: Frank P Pinchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Gulett
Represented By: Michael A Wagner
Represented By: Donna J Mikel
Represented By: Frank P Pinchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?