Gott et al v. Neuman & Esser

Plaintiff: Andrew Gott and Joanne Gott
Defendant: Neuman & Esser, Neuman & Esser USA, Inc., Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 1:2019cv00004
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/22/19. (GRE, )
January 21, 2019 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG, Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
January 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by John Doe 1, John Doe 2, Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG, Neuman & Esser USA, Inc. (Jakes, William)
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 Administrative Notice to Counsel #19 Supplement (Summons to Amended Complaint):INFORMATIONAL ONLY. In the future, please convert document into a non-fillable form ("flatten") before filing in CM/ECF.(BJL, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 21 Corrected Summons Issued as to Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG. (BJL, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG. (BJL, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT to #18 Amended Complaint Summons to Be Issued by Andrew Gott. (Norred, Robert)
January 17, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG., filed by Andrew Gott.(Norred, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file their First Amended Complaint in full compliance with all applicable rules, see E.D. Tenn. L.R. 15.1, within seven days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 1/15/2019. (BJL, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to #15 MOTION to Amend/Revise by Andrew Gott, Joanne Gott. (Norred, Robert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Revise by Andrew Gott, Joanne Gott. (Norred, Robert)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 01/10/2019. (KLWa, )
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Nonconsent) (BDG, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT of Material Facts re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Neuman & Esser USA, Inc..(Jakes, William)
January 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.. (Jakes, William)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/8/2019. (BDG, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/8/2019. (BDG, )
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 1/8/2019. (BDG, )
January 8, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (BDG, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Notice of Removal : Civil Cover Sheet not included. Please file a civil cover sheet. i.e.Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, and Supplement. Requirements due by 1/14/2019. (BDG, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Neuman & Esser identifying Corporate Parent Neuman & Esser for Neuman & Esser. (Jakes, William)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley, case number V-18-509. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3854787), filed by Neuman & Esser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint)(Jakes, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gott et al v. Neuman & Esser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Gott
Represented By: Robert G Norred, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Gott
Represented By: Robert G Norred, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuman & Esser
Represented By: William B Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuman & Esser USA, Inc.
Represented By: William B Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neuman & Esser Deutschland GmbH & Co KG
Represented By: William B Jakes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?