The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett v. Memorial Hospital et al

Plaintiff: The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett
Defendant: Hospice of Chattanooga and Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 1:2019cv00034
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Curtis L Collier
1 Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett. Memorial Hospital served on 3/4/2019. (BJL, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett. Hospice of Chattanooga served on 3/4/2019. (BJL, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JUDGMENT ORDER: Because the Court lacks power to hear cases between non-diverse parties regarding state law claims, it is ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/4/2019. (BJL, )*Mailed to the Estate of Nellie Joe Bramlett.
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Hospice of Chattanooga, Memorial Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BJL, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hospice of Chattanooga, Memorial Hospital., filed by The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett.(BJL, )
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until February 28, 2019 to re- file an amended complaint which shows that it is jurisdictionally proper for this Court to preside over this matter. If Plaintiff has not done so, it is ORDERED that this matter shall be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE at that time.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/12/2019. (BJL,)*Mailed to the Estate of Nellie Jo Bramlett.
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER finding as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as Plaintiff has paid the filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 2-11-18. (KMG, ) Modified on 2/11/2019 (BJL, ).*Mailed copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing to The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett.
February 11, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number C1016377 (BJL, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Memorial Hospital, Hospice of Chattanooga,, filed by The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett.(BJL, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett. (BJL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett v. Memorial Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospice of Chattanooga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate Of Nellie Jo Bramlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?