Westfield Insurance Group v. Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. (TWP1)

Plaintiff: Westfield and Westfield Insurance Group
Defendant: Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00036
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
0 Judge: Susan K Lee
1 Judge: Thomas W Phillips
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kenneth T. Levine on behalf of Plaintiff Westfield Insurance Group. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 04/03/2019. (KRS, )
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Nonconsent) (BDG, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc..(Sneed, David)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Mindy Delaschmitt w-Century Fire on 03/25/19 (Babb, Edward)
March 29, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3930887.) filed by Westfield Insurance Group . (BDG, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3930887.) by Westfield Insurance Group. (Babb, Edward)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time To Respond by Westfield Insurance Group. (Babb, Edward)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Sneed on behalf of All Defendants (Sneed, David)
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Group. (Babb, Edward)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 Administrative Notice to Counsel #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA :Wrong event used requirements due by 3/6/2019. (BDG, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Westfield Insurance Group. Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. served on 2/13/2019. (Babb, Edward)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 02/12/2019. (CAT)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 02/12/2019. (CAT)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas W Phillips on 02/12/2019. (CAT)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. (CAT)
February 12, 2019 District Judge Thomas W Phillips and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (CAT)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Westfield. (Babb, Edward)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Westfield. (Babb, Edward)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3889124.), filed by Westfield. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheert)(Babb, Edward) Modified on 2/11/2019 (BJL, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westfield Insurance Group v. Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc. (TWP1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westfield Insurance Group
Represented By: Edward U Babb
Represented By: Kenneth T Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Fire Protection, Inc.
Represented By: David J Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?