Williams v. 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division et al (JRG1)

Plaintiff: James Fredrick Williams
Defendant: 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Stacy Elrod, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Maximus Child Services, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Tennessee, Autry Jones and Corrections Corporation America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00048
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #101 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JCK)
April 12, 2019 Filing 103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 102 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #101 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, State of Tennessee v. Williams)(Weaver, Jennifer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Dismiss by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer)
April 12, 2019 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed Maximus Child Services served on 4/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CAT)
April 10, 2019 Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin)
April 1, 2019 Filing 98 Summons Reissued as to Maximus Child Services. (Summons mailed to pro se Plaintiff for service of process) (AMP)
March 27, 2019 Filing 97 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
March 27, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Consent by James Fredrick Williams ONLY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
March 26, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Corrections Corporation America (Polly, Erin)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Within forty-five days of this Order's date, Mr. Williams SHALL serve Maximus Child Services in accordance with Rule 4. Mr. Williams' motion for preliminary injunction [Doc. #81 ] is therefore DENIED as moot, and likewise, Maximus Child Services' motions to dismiss [Docs. #83 & #85 ] are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 03/20/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to James Williams) (AMP)
March 18, 2019 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE to Motion re #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 3/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Other notice of consent/non consent) (KFB, ) Modified on 3/15/2019 (KFB, ). Serviced via US Mail to James Frederick Williams & Olatayo Atanda.
March 11, 2019 Filing 90 Notice of RESPONSE to Motion re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (AMP)
March 11, 2019 Filing 89 RESPONSE to Motion re #79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Envelope) (AMP)
March 8, 2019 Filing 88 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin)
March 8, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin)
March 4, 2019 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #85 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hamilton County Juvenile Court Order)(Weaver, Jennifer)
March 4, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer)
March 4, 2019 Filing 84 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer)
March 4, 2019 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer)
March 4, 2019 Filing 82 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Fredrick Williams (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Address in ECF matches address on notice therefore address not updated.(JCK)
March 4, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8, #9 Attachment 9, #10 Attachment 10, #11 Envelope)(JCK)
March 1, 2019 Filing 80 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Milling, Sharon)
March 1, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Milling, Sharon)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying #71 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendants Hamilton County Juvenile Court; Hamilton County, Tennessee; Hamilton County Sheriff's Office; Hamilton County Juvenile Court Clerk; Magistrate Autry Jones; and Magistrate Chris Gott's Second Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 71] lacks this certification or any cause for why the Court should relax the requirement in this case. Their motion is therefore DENIED with leave to renew. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/26/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to James Williams) (AMP)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #68 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice By Attorney Olatayo Atanda on behalf of Defendants Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/25/2019. (KRS, ) Modified on 2/25/2019 (KFB, ). This Order serviced via US Mail to Olatayo Atanda.
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #67 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice By Attorney Jennifer L. Weaver on behalf of Defendants Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 2/25/2019. (KRS, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to James Williams) (AMP)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to James Williams) (AMP)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 02/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to James Williams) (AMP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 72 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #71 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Milling, Sharon)
February 22, 2019 Filing 71 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Milling, Sharon)
February 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #67 MOTION for Leave to File for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Maximus Child Services, Stacy Elrod, #68 MOTION for Leave to File for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Maximus Child Services, Stacy Elrod as to Stacy Elrod (KFB, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #66 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sharon McMullan Milling on behalf of 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 02/22/2019. (KRS, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 69 INFORMATIONAL NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #68 MOTION for Leave to File for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #67 MOTION for Leave to File for Admission Pro Hac Vice : (KFB, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Atanda, Olatayo)
February 21, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Weaver, Jennifer)
February 21, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Hamilton County Tennessee, Autry Jones as to 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones (KFB, )
February 20, 2019 ENTERED IN WRONG CASE. Attorney Robert Foy called our office to let us know his pro hac vice documents he mailed to the Winchester office were returned to him & mailing them to the Chattanooga office today. (KFB, ) Modified on 2/21/2019 (KFB, ).
February 19, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Milling, Sharon)
February 19, 2019 Filing 65 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. (BDG, )Notice mailed to James Fredrick Williams.
February 19, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). Attorney, Jennifer L. Weaver and Olatayo Atanda is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (BDG, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 63 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:18-cv-00355.
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER: The Report and Recommendation #56 is therefore ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss filed by the various defendants (Docket Nos. #34 , #36 , #42 , #44 ) are hereby GRANTED IN PART, and this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Tennessee, Southern Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/12/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 61 GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to James Fredrick Williams re: #56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #58 Order. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit E filed by James Fredrick Williams. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 59 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #56 Report and Recommendation and #58 Order. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Given that the pending Report and Recommendation (Docket No. #56 ), which was entered on January 3, 2019, was mailed to a previous address, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail, by certified mail, return receipt requested, another copy of the Report and Recommendation (Docket No. #56 ) to the pro se plaintiff at his present address (Docket No. #57 ). The pro se plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from receipt of the Report and Recommendation within which to file any objections thereto. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/18/19. (xc: Pro se party w/ R&R #56 by certified mail.) (dt) Modified on 1/18/2019 (dt). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Fredrick Williams. (Address updated) (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Magistrate Judge Brown recommends for the reasons explained above that DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (Docs. #34 , #36 , #42 , and #44 ) BE GRANTED IN PART and that THIS ACTION BE TRANSFERRED TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TENNESSEE, SOUTHERN DIVISION pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 1/3/19. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit D by James Fredrick Williams re #1 Complaint. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits A-C by James Fredrick Williams re #1 Complaint. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Fredrick Williams. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE to #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James Fredrick Williams. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones re #49 Reply to Response to Motion,, filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Hamilton County Tennessee, Autry Jones. (Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 27, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #49 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate event located under Other Documents. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Venue and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Exhibit A-1 Juvenile Court File, #3 Exhibit A-2 Juvenile Court File, #4 Exhibit A-3 Juvenile Court File, #5 Exhibit A-4 Juvenile Court File, #6 Exhibit A-5 Juvenile Court File, #7 Exhibit A-6 Juvenile Court File, #8 Exhibit A-7 Juvenile Court File)(Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 48 DENIAL OF DEFAULT: Pending is Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Defendants Casey Elrod and Maximus Child Services (Docket Entry No. #31 ). The request is denied. Defendants have two motions to dismiss pending (Docket Entries #34 & #44 ). Defendants' Motions to Dismiss operate as a responsive pleading and no answer is due from Defendants unless their motion is denied by the Court. In addition, the affidavit of military service filed with respect to Defendant Elrod is deficient in that it does not contain any facts to substantiate Plaintiff's statement that Defendant Elrod is not in the military service. Signed by Clerk of Court Keith Throckmorton on 6/25/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #46 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants may have until June 26, 2018 to file a ten page reply not including signatures and certificate of service. (JBB) (xc: pro se party by regular mail) Modified on 6/21/2018 (af). [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 46 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Support of #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Default Order)(Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of #42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Corrections Corporation America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Unpublished Cases)(Polly, Erin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: A telephone call was held on June 12, 2018, to consider the entry of a scheduling order and to discuss the pending motions. The Plaintiff's pending motion for an extension of time (Docket Entry #33 ) is TERMINATED as moot. Plaintiff advised that he has filed responses to the pending motions to dismiss (Docket Entries 34 and 36) and will be prepared to respond to the CoreCivic motion, which is anticipated to be filed by this coming Friday. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/13/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown: Telephone Conference held on 6/12/2018. Order to enter. (Time in Court: 30 minutes) (rd) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 40 RESPONSE to #36 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Venue and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by James Fredrick Williams. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a motion for an extension of time (Docket Entry #33 ) to reply to the Defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket Entry #13 ). The motion is DENIED as moot. This matter is set for a telephone conference on June 12, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. (Docket Entry #30 ). At this conference the Magistrate Judge hopes to set a scheduling order. The Defendants have now filed renewed motions to dismiss and the Plaintiff will be given deadlines to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 6/12/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 38 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Initial filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Corrections Corporation America, Stacy Elrod, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones, Maximus Child Services. (Polly, Erin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support of #36 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Venue and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones . (Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 36 Second MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Venue and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM in Support of #34 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services . (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time by James Fredrick Williams. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for Entry of Default by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Entry of Default and Affidavit)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2018 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: The pending motion to dismiss (Docket Entry #13 ) will be TERMINATED as moot subject to being refiled in connection with the amended complaint. This case is set for a Rule 16 case management conference on Tuesday, June 12, 2018, at 2:00 p.m., by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/29/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail w/ 1983 complaint form.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 25, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Olatayo Atanda. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Olatayo Atanda on behalf of Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services (Atanda, Olatayo) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by James Fredrick Williams.(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing by James Fredrick Williams. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS returned executed by James Fredrick Williams. Corrections Corporation America served on 5/10/2018. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the #1 Complaint. Corrections Corporation America answer due 6/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/17/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 24 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 17, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Joseph F. Welborn, III and Erin Palmer Polly. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 22 BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Corrections Corporation America. (Polly, Erin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Palmer Polly on behalf of Corrections Corporation America (Polly, Erin) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Welborn, III on behalf of Corrections Corporation America (Welborn, Joseph) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a motion to amend his complaint (Docket Entry #17 ). If the Plaintiff wishes to file an amended complaint he must file a single document, which contains all of his causes of action. Absent an amended complaint, the Plaintiff is still required to respond to the present motion to dismiss, or file an actual amended complaint, which is complete in all details. The Plaintiff does not need Court permission to file such an amended complaint, provided he does it within 21 days of filing of the motion to dismiss. The Clerk will terminate the motion to amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/15/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service filed by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Maximus Child Services, Stacy Elrod. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint to Add Party by James Fredrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Proposed Amended Complaint)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Notice to Filer re DE #15 : Pursuant to Local Rule 5.01, all filings shall include a Certificate of Service and it shall identify by name the person served, what was served, the method of service, and date of service. Counsel SHALL FILE a conformed Certificate of Service for this document using the Certificate eventlocated under Other Documents. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 14, 2018 TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Neill Southerland and Jennifer L. Weaver. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendants Maximus, Inc. and Stacy Elrod have filed a motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint (Docket Entry 15). The motion is GRANTED and the Defendants shall have until May 31, 2018, to answer or otherwise respond. The remaining Defendants have filed a motion to dismiss (Docket Entry 13), supported by a memorandum of law (Docket Entry 14). The Plaintiff must respond to this motion, either by filing an amended complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15, or by filing a response to the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 5/11/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Stacy Elrod, Maximus Child Services. (Weaver, Jennifer) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Venue and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones . (Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Venue and Failure to State a Claim upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division, Chris Gotti, Hamilton County Sheriff's Department, Hamilton County Tennessee, IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division, Autry Jones. (Southerland, Mary) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 12 Summons reissued as to Corrections Corporation America. (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Fredrick Williams as to Corrections Corporation America. (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joe Brown to oversee service of process on the defendants, to enter a scheduling order for the management of the case, to dispose or recommend disposition of any pretrial motions under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), and to conduct further proceedings, if necessary, under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of Court. The plaintiff is notified that he is responsible for effecting service of process on the defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The plaintiff is further notified that he MUST keep the court informed at all times of his current address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/3/18. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Corrections Corporation America. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Fredrick Williams as to Corrections Corporation America. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Reissued as to Corrections Corporation America. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by James Fredrick Williams as to Corrections Corporation America. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed by James Fredrick Williams. 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division served on 4/19/2018; Stacy Elrod served on 4/18/2018; Chris Gotti served on 4/18/2018; Hamilton County Sheriff's Department served on 4/18/2018; Hamilton County Tennessee served on 4/19/2018; IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division served on 4/18/2018; Autry Jones served on 4/18/2018; Maximus Child Services served on 4/19/2018. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Fredrick Williams. (Address updated.) (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 11, 2018 NOTICE mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service for included). (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to all defendants. (Service copies returned to plaintiff by mail.) (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 2 RECEIPT #36187 in the amount of $400.00 posted by James Fredrick re #1 Complaint. (dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Filing fee $400, paid), filed by James Fredrick. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 2/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fredrick Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 42 U.S.C. Section 654(3) Child Support Division
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Elrod
Represented By: Olatayo Atanda
Represented By: Jennifer L. Weaver
Represented By: Olatayo O. Atanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IV-D Contractor Hamilton County Clerk of Court Division
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximus Child Services
Represented By: Olatayo Atanda
Represented By: Jennifer L. Weaver
Represented By: Olatayo O. Atanda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gotti
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton County Tennessee
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autry Jones
Represented By: Sharon McMullan Milling
Represented By: Mary Neill Southerland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation America
Represented By: Joseph F Welborn, III
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?