United States of America v. The Real Property Located at 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097 and The Real Property Located at 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 SEALED Document by United States of America. (BJL, )
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #5 Motion to Stay. The Government is further ORDERED to file a sealed status report on or before September 9, 2019 and every six months thereafter throughout the pendency of the stay, updating the Court on the progress of the related criminal investigation. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/13/2019. (BJL, )
March 12, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (aws, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/12/19. (aws, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/12/19. (aws, )
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/12/19. (aws, )
March 12, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added per chambers. (aws, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED Proposed Sealed Document re: #3 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America . (Mohr, Gretchen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM against 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097, filed by United States of America.(Mohr, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Real Property Located at 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property Located at 6385 Bellmoore Park Lane, Johns Creek, Georgia 30097
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?