Richardson v. Isle Edge Trucking, Inc. et al (TV3)

Plaintiff: Stanley E Richardson
Defendant: Isle Edge Trucking, Inc., Royal Express, Inc. and Steven Allen Burdick
Case Number: 1:2019cv00136
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: A final pretrial conference will be held in Knoxville on Tuesday, July 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The trial of this case will be held in Knoxville before the undersigned with a jury beginning on Tuesday, August 4, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on June 24, 2019. (AYB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley E Richardson. Royal Express, Inc. served on 6/6/2019. (Gilreath, Sidney)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley E Richardson. Steven Allen Burdick served on 6/6/2019. (Gilreath, Sidney)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Steven Allen Burdick, Isle Edge Trucking, Inc., Royal Express, Inc. (Stackhouse, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Steven Allen Burdick, Isle Edge Trucking, Inc., Royal Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stackhouse, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Royal Express, Inc.. (Stackhouse, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Isle Edge Trucking, Inc.. (Stackhouse, Mary)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Non-Consent) (BDG)
June 6, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Isle Edge Trucking, Inc., Royal Express, Inc.. (BDG)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 Alias Summons Issued as to Steven Allen Burdick, Royal Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BDG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Steven Allen Burdick, Isle Edge Trucking, Inc., Royal Express, Inc..(Stackhouse, Mary)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Alias Summons to Royal Express, Inc. by Stanley E Richardson. (Gilreath, Sidney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Alias Summons to Burdick by Stanley E Richardson. (Gilreath, Sidney)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Stanley E Richardson as to Steven Allen Burdick. (Gilreath, Sidney)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley E Richardson. Royal Express, Inc. served on 5/10/2019. (Gilreath, Sidney)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stanley E Richardson. Isle Edge Trucking, Inc. served on 5/21/2019. (Gilreath, Sidney)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/17/2019. (BDG)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/17/2019. (BDG)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/17/2019. (BDG)
May 17, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to case no. 1:19-cv-14. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Thomas A. Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger, this case will be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 5/16/19. (Steger, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Steven Allen Burdick, Isle Edge Trucking, Inc., and Royal Express, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Royal Express, Inc., #2 Summons Steven Allen Burdick) (AMP)
May 7, 2019 The case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Steger for related case determination. (AMP)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, by Stanley E Richardson. (Gilreath, Sidney)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: Please file a signed and dated Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable form using the even Supplement under Other Documents and link it to the Complaint. Requirements due by 5/13/2019. (AMP)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3966104.), filed by Stanley E Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Other Corporate Disclosure, #3 Summons Summons - Isle Edge, #4 Summons Summons - Royal Express, #5 Summons Summons - Burdick)(Gilreath, Sidney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Isle Edge Trucking, Inc. et al (TV3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isle Edge Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Express, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Allen Burdick
Represented By: Mary Ann Stackhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley E Richardson
Represented By: Sidney W Gilreath
Represented By: Cary L Bauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?