Ledford et al v. Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Beverly Ledford and Craig Ledford
Defendant: Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC. and Circle K. Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00137
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 21 PRETRIAL DISCLOSURE by Circle K. Stores, Inc..(Peterson, Nicholas)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6-20-19. (KMG)
June 20, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2019 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/18/19. (JBR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF CONSENT to Magistrate by Circle K. Stores, Inc. (Peterson, Nicholas)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/4/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/28/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/11/19. (JBR)
June 4, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Allen Murphy Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3980477.) filed by Beverly Ledford, Craig Ledford as to Beverly Ledford, Craig Ledford (SAC)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Allen Murphy Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3980477.) - Updated Certificate of Good Standing by Beverly Ledford, Craig Ledford. (Brock, Jamieson)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Allen Murphy Jr. (SAC)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of J. Allen Murphy Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3980477.) by Beverly Ledford, Craig Ledford. (Brock, Jamieson)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 Informational only - Administrative Notice to Counsel #11 Supplement. (SAC)
May 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC.. (Peterson, Nicholas)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Nonconsent) (JCK)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/2019. (JCK)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/2019. (JCK)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Depositions, Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/9/2019. (JCK)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Attorney John Allen Murphy, Jr. is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistrate judge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motion can be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (JCK)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Please file a civil cover sheet using the event Supplement, found under the category Other Documents, and link it back to the Notice of Removal. Requirements due by 5/14/2019. (JCK)
May 9, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Circle K Stores, Inc., Corporate Parent Couche-Tard US Inc. for Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC.. (Peterson, Nicholas)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Defendants Corrected ANSWER to Complaint by Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC Circle K. Stores, Inc.(Peterson, Nicholas) Modified on 5/9/2019 to add Circle K. Stores, Inc. (JCK).
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC..(Peterson, Nicholas)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bradley Circuit Court, case number V-18-663. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3967327), filed by Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC..(Peterson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledford et al v. Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mac's Convenience Stores, LLC.
Represented By: Nicholas J Peterson
Represented By: Terry Ryan Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K. Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J Peterson
Represented By: Terry Ryan Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Ledford
Represented By: Jamieson Brock
Represented By: John Allen Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Ledford
Represented By: Jamieson Brock
Represented By: John Allen Murphy, Jr.
Represented By: Christian Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?