K.B. v. City of Chattanooga
Plaintiff: K. B.
Defendant: City of Chattanooga
Case Number: 1:2019cv00145
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Chattanooga. (Kelly, Joseph)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by K. B.. (Smith, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by City of Chattanooga. (Kelly, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Chattanooga. (Kelly, Joseph)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by K. B..(Smith, Christopher)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph A Kelly on behalf of City of Chattanooga (Kelly, Joseph)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on City of Chattanooga on May 15, 2019, filed by K. B.. (Smith, Dominick)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher Smith on behalf of K. B. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 05/20/2019. (KRS) Modified on 5/20/2019 (BDG). Order mailed and emailed to Smith.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley Chadwick Phillips on behalf of Plaintiff K. B. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 05/20/2019. (KRS) Modified on 5/20/2019 (BDG). Order mailed and emailed to Phillips.
May 17, 2019 Filing 11 ***INFORMATIONAL ONLY*** Administrative Notice to Counsel #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Smith :Please make sure to flatten all documents. (BDG)
May 17, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chad Phillips filed by K. B., #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Smith filed by K. B. as to K. B. (BDG)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher Smith by K. B.. (Smith, Dominick)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chad Phillips by K. B.. (Smith, Dominick)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/14/19. (AWS) Mailed to W. Lyon Chadwick, Chad Phillips, and Christopher Smith.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/14/19. (AWS) Mailed to W. Lyon Chadwick, Chad Phillips, and Christopher Smith.
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 5/14/19. (AWS) Mailed to W. Lyon Chadwick, Chad Phillips, and Christopher Smith.
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AWS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIONAL Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Dominick Smith re #1 Complaint. (AWS) Modified on 5/14/2019 to edit text. (AWS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Chad Phillips & Christopher W Smith re #1 Complaint. PHV Requirements Deadline: 06/03/2019. (AWS) Mailed to Chad Phillips & Christopher W Smith.
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to W Lyon Chadwick, Jr re #1 Complaint : requirements due by 5/20/2019. (AWS) Mailed to W Lyon Chadwick, Jr.
May 14, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT K.B. against City of Chattanooga ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3970811.), filed by K. B.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons - City of Chattanooga)(Smith, Dominick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K.B. v. City of Chattanooga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chattanooga
Represented By: Melinda J Foster
Represented By: Joseph Allen Kelly
Represented By: Phillip A Noblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B.
Represented By: Dominick R Smith
Represented By: Christopher W Smith
Represented By: W Lyon Chadwick, Jr
Represented By: David R Smith
Represented By: Stanley Chadwick Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?