Harrison v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV2)

Plaintiff: Elizabeth Browdy Harrison
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00154
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on US Attorney on 7/1/2019, filed by Elizabeth Browdy Harrison. (Osterhout, Karl)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service for Summons & Complaint served on US Attorney on June 28, 2019, filed by Elizabeth Browdy Harrison. (Osterhout, Karl) Modified on 7/1/2019 (BJL).
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re IFP Service re #7 Summons Issued as to USA (BJL)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (BJL)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk's Office shall send a service packet, to the extent necessary, to Plaintiff's counsel for completion and prompt return to the Clerk's Office which shall then forward the service packet to the United States Marshal for service. The United States Marshal shall advance all costs of service. However, if the plaintiff decides to provide his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear their own costs. Plaintiff is hereby put ON NOTICE that failure to serve the defendant(s) in the time required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) may result in this action being dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6-20-19. This constitutes the complete order of the Court. (KMG)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 5-23-19. (KMG) Modified on 5/24/2019 (BJL).
May 22, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977265.) filed by Elizabeth Browdy Harrison as to Elizabeth Browdy Harrison (KFB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977265.) : (KFB)
May 21, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (KFB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3977265.) by Elizabeth Browdy Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for PA Supreme Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for WD PA)(Osterhout, Karl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Browdy Harrison. (Osterhout, Karl)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Elizabeth Browdy Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Browdy Harrison
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?