United States of America v. 132 Ferro Street, Pikeville, Tennessee 37367
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 132 Ferro Street, Pikeville, Tennessee 37367
Case Number: 1:2019cv00163
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed. (SAC)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay.The Government is further ORDERED to file a status report on or before August 28, 2019. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/1/2019. (SAC)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/28/19. (GRE)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/28/19. (GRE)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/28/19. (GRE)
June 28, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (GRE)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to case nos. 1:19-cv-61 and 1:19-cv-64. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the three cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Sandy Mattice and Magistrate Judge Christopher Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6/25/2019. (Steger, Christopher)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Mohr, Gretchen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint by United States of America. (Mohr, Gretchen)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN REM against 132 Ferro Street, Pikeville, Tennessee 37367, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of David Kukura)(Mohr, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 132 Ferro Street, Pikeville, Tennessee 37367
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 132 Ferro Street, Pikeville, Tennessee 37367
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gretchen Jenkins Mohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?