Bandy v. Roberts
Plaintiff: Justin Bandy and Justin N. Bandy
Defendant: Kelvin Roberts and Kelvin D. Roberts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00164
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Travis R McDonough
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/31/19. (KFB)
July 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Travis R McDonough: Scheduling Conference held on 7/30/2019. ( No Court Reporter/ No Courtroom Deputy present) (BJL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kelvin Roberts., filed by Justin Bandy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Installment Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Deed, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Quitclaim Deed, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Settlement Statement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Installment Note, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Deed to Secure Debt, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Settlement Statement, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Quitclaim Deed)(Aho, Donald)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2019 is hereby RESET for 7/30/2019, at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/22/2019. (CMH)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER The Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2019 is hereby RESET for 7/30/2019, at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 7/22/2019. (CMH)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Upon joint motion of the parties for an extension of time, and for good cause shown, the motion [Doc. 13] is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint by July 26, 2019; (2) Defendants July 18, 2018, deadline to respond to Plaintiff's initial Complaint is canceled; and (3) Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint within 14 days of the filing of that pleading. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/15/19. (Steger, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Justin Bandy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Aho, Donald)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Aho, Donald)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/24/2019, at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 6/24/2019. (CMH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Time to Answer by Kelvin Roberts. (Presley, Buddy)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Kelvin D. Roberts on 6/5/209, filed by Justin Bandy. (Aho, Donald)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 6-11-19. (KMG) Modified on 6/11/2019 (BJL).*Mailed to Attorney Alexander Vey.
June 10, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Vey Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3993705. filed by Justin Bandy (BJL)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alexander Vey ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3993705.) by Justin Bandy. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Aho, Donald)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac)as to Atty Alexander C. Vey (DJH) (Copy of Notice mailed to Atty Vey) Modified on 6/6/2019 (DJH).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/6/2019. (DJH)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/6/2019. (DJH)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 6/6/2019. (DJH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kelvin Roberts. (DJH)
June 5, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (DJH)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kelvin Roberts ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3990998.), filed by Justin Bandy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit 1 - Installment Note with Balloon Payment 11.25.15, #4 Exhibit 2 - Deed to Secure Debt 11.25.15, #5 Exhibit 3 - Quitclaim Deed 11.25.15, #6 Exhibit 4 - Settlement Statement 11.25.15, #7 Exhibit 5 - Installment Note with Balloon Payment 11.01.16, #8 Exhibit 6 - Deed to Secure Debt 11.01.16, #9 Exhibit 7 - Settlement Statement 05.26.17, #10 Exhibit 8 - Quitclaim Deed 06.09.17)(Aho, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bandy v. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bandy
Represented By: Donald J Aho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin N. Bandy
Represented By: Donald J Aho
Represented By: Alexander C. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin D. Roberts
Represented By: Buddy B Presley, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?