EMCASCO Insurance Company et al v. Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company and EMCASCO Insurance Company
Defendant: Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland, Charles T. Weston, Christa A. Dansby and Tyson Leamon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00165
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Tyson Leamon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Amend with attachments)(Flynn, Charles)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/24/2019. (BDG)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland.(Norred, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/6/2019. (JCK)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/6/2019. (JCK)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/6/2019. (JCK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Christa A. Dansby(Individually), Christa A. Dansby, Tyson Leamon, Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland, Charles T. Weston. (Attachments: #1 Summons Christa A. Dansby, #2 Summons Charles T. Weston, #3 Summons Tyson Leamon)(JCK)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Informational only. For future reference, please submit summons in a non-fillable format. (JCK)
June 6, 2019 Case transferred in from Northeastern Division on 06/06/2019 due to a docketing error. This case was initially filed as 2:19-CV-96, but was styled for the Southern Division. All future pleadings should be filed in 1:19-CV-165.(JCK)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christa A. Dansby, Tyson Leamon, N'Awlins, Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland d/b/a Howard Johnson Inn, Charles A. Weston ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3990801.), filed by EMCASCO Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Summons Leamon, #6 Summons Weston, #7 Summons Dansby, #8 Summons Shriji)(Stewart, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMCASCO Insurance Company et al v. Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shriji, Inc. of Cleveland
Represented By: Robert G Norred, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T. Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christa A. Dansby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Leamon
Represented By: Charles A Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Jonathan D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMCASCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan D Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?