Kilgore v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Sherry Kilgore
Defendant: SSA and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 1:2019cv00168
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Debra C Poplin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE re IFP Service (AYB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons Social Security Administrator, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney General) (AYB)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall issue summons and the United States Marshal, or the plaintiff, shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon all defendant(s) as directed by the plaintiff. If the United States Marshal provides the service, all costs of service shall be advanced by the United States. If the plaintiff provides his/her own service, the plaintiff will bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin on July 1, 2019. (AYB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sherry Kilgore. (Jackson, Forrest)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel #1 Complaint - SSA, : Please file the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis separately using the event In Forma Pauperis (Proceed) under Motions. Requirements due by 6/12/2019. (AMP)
June 7, 2019 District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT against SSA, filed by Sherry Kilgore. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Sheet, #2 Summons #1, #3 Summons #2, #4 Summons #3, #5 Other Assignment of EAJA Fees, #6 Supplement Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees)(Jackson, Forrest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kilgore v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Kilgore
Represented By: Forrest Earl Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?