Sullivan et al v. Resolute FP US Inc.
Plaintiff: Rex Sullivan and Rose Sullivan
Defendant: Resolute FP US Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00173
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2019 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/8/2019. (AML)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Resolute FP US Inc. (Wolfe, Joshua)
August 6, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (AML)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/25/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/30/2019. (AML)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/24/19. (MRE)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Resolute FP US Inc..(Wolfe, Joshua)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/13/2019. (BDG)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/13/2019. (BDG)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/13/2019. (BDG)
June 13, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BDG)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Resolute FP US Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Resolute Forest Products, Inc. for Resolute FP US Inc.. (Wolfe, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rhea County Circuit Court, case number 2019-cv-123. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3996861), filed by Resolute FP US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Collective Exhibit A)(Wolfe, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan et al v. Resolute FP US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex Sullivan
Represented By: Patrick A Cruise
Represented By: Hubert E Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Sullivan
Represented By: Patrick A Cruise
Represented By: Hubert E Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resolute FP US Inc.
Represented By: Joshua A Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?