Williams v. CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Patrick Williams
Defendant: Stephen D. Lebovitz, A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz and CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.
Petitioner: Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner, Jeff Lion, Hoffinvestco, Ronald A. Fish, Brent Cowin, Houlihan and Company LLC, Charles D. Hoffman and Lydia Hoffman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00181
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting (56) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (60) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-15-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (56 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 60 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory C. Cook of Balch & Bingham LLP filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., Stephen D. Lebovitz, Farzana Khaleel, A. Larry Chapman, Charles B. Lebovitz Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(AWS)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting (54) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-14-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory C. Cook of Balch & Bingham LLP ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4049274.) by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (58 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of B. Warren Pope of King & Spalding LLP filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., Stephen D. Lebovitz, Farzana Khaleel, A. Larry Chapman, Charles B. Lebovitz Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(AWS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (48 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of B. Warren Pope of King & Spalding LLP ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4048243.) by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Filing 53 EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(ABF)
August 6, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re (44 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 48 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (38 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (48 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 52 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel in further support filed by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - S. Scolnick Account Holdings, #2 Exhibit B - Scolnick Declaration, #3 Exhibit D - Form 5500)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah)
August 6, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re (15 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (48 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (9 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Brent Cowin's Reply Concerning Gainey McKenna & Egleston's Fraud on the Court filed by Brent Cowin. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Gonnello, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 50 BRIEF in Further Support of the Hoffmans' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER : This matter is before the Court on Notice of Houlihan & Company LLC, Ronald A. Fish, and Jeff Lion's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel Doc. #9 ,Motion by Charles D. Hoffman, HoffInvestCo, and Lydia Hoffman for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel Doc. #12 , Brett Cowin's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Doc. #15 , and Motion of Jay Scolnick and Mark Shaner to: (1) Appoint Lead Plaintiffs; and (2) Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel Doc. #48 . The parties are ORDERED to appear before the Court for a hearing on the motions on Thursday, September 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., at the James H. Quillen United States Courthouse. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (CAT)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (34) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-6-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (35) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-6-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: 1. All future filings in Williams, Case no.1:19-cv-00181, and in Merelles, Case no. 1:19-cv- 00193, shall be filed in the Williams case, and that the case caption be changed to reflect "Consolidated Case No. 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS" (instead of the current "Consolidated Case No. 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS"). 2. The Clerk of Court shall disassociate Paskowitz v. CBL & Associates, et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, from Williams v. CBL & Associates, et al., Case no. 1:19-cv- 00181, and from Merelles v. CBL & Associates, et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00193, in the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/2/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193- JRG-CHS (GRE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for Discovery by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 43 Administrative Notice to Counsel Klein re: Motion for Discovery #54 , requirements due by 8/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(SAC)
July 31, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (46 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 30 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 34 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Alexander Hood II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034501.) filed by Patrick Williams, (47 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 35 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 31 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy A. Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034507.) filed by Patrick Williams Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS(JBR)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT re (45 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) Response to Motion,,, by Brent Cowin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Gonnello, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (29 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Brent Cowin's Response to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions and Notice of Fraud on the Court filed by Brent Cowin. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Gonnello, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT in Support re (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (19 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (54 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 38 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (19 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (54 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 38 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Discovery by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs filed by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re (16 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (9 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Non-Opposition To Competing Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Houlihan and Company LLC, Ronald A. Fish, Jeff Lion. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Stranch, J.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (15 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (30 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (22 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (30 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (30 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
July 29, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by John Collins, Joanna Lienti, Thomas Stoves re (35 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) Memorandum in Support of Motion Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Wood, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy A. Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034507.) by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (JBR).
July 29, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Alexander Hood II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034501.) by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (JBR).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS; granting (27) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-29-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS (KMG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of party Plaintiff Paskowitz by Laurence Paskowitz Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Bramlett, Paul)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 nORDER granting (41) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting (42) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS; granting (25) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting (26) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (29) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting (30) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-23-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
July 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (25 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 29 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 41 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Klein ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028148.) filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco, (30 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 26 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJeffrey S. Abraham ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028159.) filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS(AML)
July 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (25 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 29 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 41 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Klein filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco, (30 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 26 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJeffrey S. Abraham filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(AWS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJeffrey S. Abraham ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028159.) by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Klein ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028148.) by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS; granting (23) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-19-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
July 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard W. Gonnello ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4026446.) filed by Brent Cowin (AML)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard W. Gonnello ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4026446.) by Brent Cowin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Richard W. Gonnello-USDC-SDNY)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Cain, Chris)
July 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Friedman Group re (29 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Appoint #29 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Bramlett, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The actions styled Paskowitz v. CBL & Associates et al., Case no. 1:19- cv-00149-JRG-CHS, Williams v. CBL & Associates et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00181, and Merelles v. CBL & Associates et al., Case no. 1:19-CV-00193, are consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in the consolidated action shall be made in Case No. 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Jeffrey Abraham and Michael Klein) (AMP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to J. Gerard Stranch & John W Chandler re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, #9 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (AWS)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Richard W. Gonnello re #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff : requirements due by 8/2/2019. (AWS) Mailed to Richard W. Gonnello.
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Jeffrey S Abraham & Michael J Klein re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion: requirements due by 8/2/2019. (AWS) Mailed to Jeffrey S Abraham & Michael J Klein.
July 16, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, (Filed into new lead case per law clerk)(JCK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Brent Cowin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cain, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Brent Cowin. (Cain, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Brent Cowin. (Cain, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chandler, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Chandler, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, John) Modified on 8/6/2019 to reinstate pending motion (JCK).
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Patrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Press Release, #2 Exhibit B: Certs and Schedule A's, #3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D: GPM Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E: Rosen Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit F: BSJ Firm Resume)(Stranch, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Patrick Williams. (Stranch, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Patrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification and Schedule A, #2 Other Proposed Order)(Stranch, J.) Modified on 8/6/2019 to reinstate pending motion (JCK).
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.. (Shaw, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Order Addressing Certain early Scheduling Matters by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Shaw, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, Scott)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/27/19. (AWS)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/27/19. (AWS)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 6/27/19. (AWS)
June 27, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AWS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to case no. 1:19-cv-149 (Paskowitz, et al. v. CBL & Associates, et al.). The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H. STeger on 6/25/2019.(Steger, Christopher)
June 24, 2019 Case forwarded to Judge Steger for related case determination. (ABF)
June 24, 2019 No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz.. (ABF)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4005064.), filed by Patrick Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Lebovitz
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Larry Chapman
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farzana Khaleel
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Lebovitz
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: B Warren Pope
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Williams
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay Scolnick
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: James Al Holifield, Jr
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Shaner
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: James Al Holifield, Jr
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Lion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hoffinvestco
Represented By: John W Chandler, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey S Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald A. Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brent Cowin
Represented By: Richard William Gonnello
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Houlihan and Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles D. Hoffman
Represented By: John W Chandler, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey S Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lydia Hoffman
Represented By: John W Chandler, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey S Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?