Helms et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Linda Helms and Gary Helms
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00185
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT of the parties by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Callaway, Gregory)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/1/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr.. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr..Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/30/2019. (BDG)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Walmart, Inc without prejudice by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other proposed order)(Callaway, Gregory)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Callaway, Gregory)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/3/19. (MRE)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent/ Notice of Nonconsent) (BDG)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Callaway, Gregory)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/27/2019. (AML)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/27/2019. (AML)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 6/27/2019. (AML)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal : Filing Fee was not Received. Payment due immediately. (AML)
June 27, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AML)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Bradley County, case number V-19-289. (), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Other civil cover sheet)(Callaway, Gregory) Modified on 6/27/2019 - Per Court financial deputy, payment was made, just not recorded properly through ECF. Status has been updated. $400 payment made on 6/26, Receipt 0649-4008247 (AML).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helms et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Helms
Represented By: Patrick A Cruise
Represented By: Hubert E Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Helms
Represented By: Patrick A Cruise
Represented By: Hubert E Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?