Ramirez v. America Midwest Transportation, LLC et al (PLR3)
Plaintiff: Maria Ramirez
Defendant: America Midwest Transportation, LLC and Timothy D. Overton
Case Number: 1:2019cv00187
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/23/2019. (SAC)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Revise #14 Answer to Complaint by America Midwest Transportation, LLC, Timothy D. Overton. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Agreed Order)(Jones, Jane)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/8/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/13/19. (JBR)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by America Midwest Transportation, LLC, Timothy D. Overton.(Briley, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by America Midwest Transportation, LLC, Timothy D. Overton Serving Discovery on Plaintiff (Jones, Jane)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ramirez. Timothy D. Overton served on 7/16/2019. (Ellis, Danny)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Ramirez. America Midwest Transportation, LLC served on 7/15/2019. (Ellis, Danny)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Defendants' unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Without objection, Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before August 12, 2019. This docket text entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee. (Lee, Susan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by America Midwest Transportation, LLC, Timothy D. Overton. (Jones, Jane)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane Kaufman Jones on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, Jane)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/28/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/28/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 06/28/2019. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to America Midwest Transportation, LLC, and Timothy D. Overton. (Attachments: #1 Summons Timothy D. Overton) (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel: No action to be taken. For future reference, please file the Summons and Civil Cover Sheet in a non-fillable form. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AMP)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4010413.), filed by Maria Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Other, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Ellis, Danny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. America Midwest Transportation, LLC et al (PLR3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Ramirez
Represented By: Danny R Ellis
Represented By: Morgan G Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Midwest Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Jane Kaufman Jones
Represented By: Kenneth R Shuttleworth
Represented By: Robert W Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Overton
Represented By: Jane Kaufman Jones
Represented By: Kenneth R Shuttleworth
Represented By: Robert W Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?