Rubenstein v. University of Tennessee
Plaintiff: Steven J Rubenstein
Defendant: Wayne Davis, Matthew Scoggins, Society of Actuaries, American Academy of Actuaries, Katrice Morgan, Defendants 1 and 2 in Collusion, University of Tennessee, Mark Whorton, Linda Martin, The Academy Cowards and Steve Salky
Case Number: 1:2019cv00189
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 08/22/2019. (KLW)
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Society of Actuaries.(Collins, K.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/16/2019. (BJL)*Mailed to Steven J. Rubenstein.
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven J Rubenstein. (BJL) Modified on 8/16/2019 (BJL).
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 8/16/2019. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 8/15/2019. (DJH)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dermot Lynch on behalf of Defendants American Academy of Actuaries and Steve Salky. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 08/14/2019. (KRS)
August 14, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4027111.) filed by Steve Salky, American Academy of Actuaries as to American Academy of Actuaries, Steve Salky (DJH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons served on Tammy Fluwider on 7/1/2019, filed by Steven J Rubenstein. (DJH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Steven J Rubenstein. (DJH)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Steven J Rubenstein. (DJH)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/31/2019. (SAC)Order mailed to Rubenstein.
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Society of Actuaries. (Collins, K.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by American Academy of Actuaries, Steve Salky. (Lynch, Dermot)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by American Academy of Actuaries, Steve Salky. (Lynch, Dermot)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4027111.) by American Academy of Actuaries, Steve Salky. (Lynch, Dermot)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wayne Davis, Linda Martin, Katrice Morgan, Matthew Scoggins, University of Tennessee, Mark Whorton. (Powell, Rachel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wayne Davis, Linda Martin, Katrice Morgan, Matthew Scoggins, University of Tennessee, Mark Whorton. (Powell, Rachel)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/3/2019. (DJH)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/3/2019. (DJH)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 7/3/2019. (DJH)
July 3, 2019 Copy of order reassigning case, order governing motion to dismiss, depositions and sealing confidential information mailed to Steven J Rubenstein (DJH)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-styled case has been reviewed pursuant to E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3), and the Court concludes this case is related to previously filed case No. 1:16-cv-475-HSM-SKL, styled Steven Rubenstein v. The University of Tennessee, et al. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign this case to the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to the previously filed case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 7/3/2019. (DJH)
June 28, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (DJH)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (CNC) Mailed to Steven Rubenstein (CNC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Original summons forms were given to Mr. Rubenstein at the Clerk's Office intake counter. (CNC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400. Receipt #C1016768), filed by Steven J Rubenstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CNC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubenstein v. University of Tennessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Davis
Represented By: Rachel King Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Scoggins
Represented By: Rachel King Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society of Actuaries
Represented By: K. Chris Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Academy of Actuaries
Represented By: Dermot Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrice Morgan
Represented By: Rachel King Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants 1 and 2 in Collusion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Tennessee
Represented By: Rachel King Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Whorton
Represented By: Rachel King Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Martin
Represented By: Rachel King Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Academy Cowards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Salky
Represented By: Dermot Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J Rubenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?