Owens v. CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Owens and Shannon Goad Owens
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC, CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC and CorrectCare Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00191
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Travis R McDonough
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Polly, Erin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Terrence M. McKelvey on behalf of CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 07/17/2019. (KRS)
July 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Terrence M. McKelvey filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (AWS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Terrence M. McKelvey Declaration of Terrence M. McKelvey (Polly, Erin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Terrence M. McKelvey Certificate of Good Standing (Polly, Erin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Terrence M. McKelvey by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Polly, Erin)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER Case Management Conference RESET for 8/29/2019 at 02:30 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/11/2019. (TRT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC (Polly, Erin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CorrectCare Solutions, Inc.. (Carey, Susan)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by CorrectCare Solutions, Inc. (AWS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Alaina M Beach re #6 Answer to Complaint: requirements due by 7/15/2019. (AWS) Mailed to Alaina M Beach.
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Terrence McKelvey re #7 Answer to Complaint: requirements due by 7/25/2019. (AWS) Modified on 7/9/2019 Mailed to Terrence McKelvey . (AWS)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS) Modified on 7/9/2019 Mailed to Alaina M Beach and Terrence McKelvey . (AWS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CoreCivic, Inc., Corporate Parent CoreCivic TRS, LLC for CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Polly, Erin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC.(Polly, Erin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by CorrectCare Solutions, Inc..(Carey, Susan)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/3/2019. (TRT)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/19. (JBR)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/19. (JBR)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 7/2/19. (JBR)
July 2, 2019 District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 19C342. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4012199), filed by CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Circuit Court File, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Other Corporate Disclosure Statement of CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC)(Polly, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoreCivic of Tennessee, LLC
Represented By: Erin Palmer Polly
Represented By: Joseph F Welborn, III
Represented By: Terrence McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CorrectCare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Ramsay Cole
Represented By: Susan West Carey
Represented By: Alaina M Beach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Goad Owens
Represented By: John M Wolfe, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?