Merelles v. CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Plaintiff: Alberto Merelles
Defendant: Stephen D. Lebovitz, A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. and Charles B. Lebovitz
Petitioner: Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner, Jeff Lion, Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Ronald A. Fish, Brent Cowin, Houlihan and Company LLC and Lydia Hoffman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00193
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE re(59 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) Order,, . Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah)
August 22, 2019 Filing 64 RESPONSE re(42 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) Affidavit filed by Brent Cowin, (41 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) Response to Motion,,, filed by Brent Cowin . (Attachments: #1 Other Declaration of Thomas J. McKenna, #2 Other Declaration of Gregory M. Egleston)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(McKenna, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER re (57 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 53 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) EX PARTE MOTION. This matter is before the Court on Movants Jay Scolnick and Mark Shaners' Ex Parte Motion for in Camera Review of Exhibit C to Reply Memorandum of Law [Doc. 53]. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to lift the seal from this motion. Within seven days of this Order's date, Mr. Sconick and Mr. Shaner SHALL provide the Court with satisfactory reasons as to why it should permit Exhibit C [Doc. 53-1] to remain under seal. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/20/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(JCK)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting (56) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (60) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-15-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 15, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (56 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 60 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory C. Cook of Balch & Bingham LLP filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., Stephen D. Lebovitz, Farzana Khaleel, A. Larry Chapman, Charles B. Lebovitz Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(AWS)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting (54) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-14-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 14, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory C. Cook of Balch & Bingham LLP ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4049274.) by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
August 14, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (58 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of B. Warren Pope of King & Spalding LLP filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., Stephen D. Lebovitz, Farzana Khaleel, A. Larry Chapman, Charles B. Lebovitz Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(AWS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (48 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
August 13, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of B. Warren Pope of King & Spalding LLP ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4048243.) by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Filing 57 EX PARTE MOTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(ABF) Modified on 8/20/2019 to unseal main document per Order doc. 63, attachment remains sealed (JCK).
August 6, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re (44 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 48 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (38 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (48 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 52 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel in further support filed by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - S. Scolnick Account Holdings, #2 Exhibit B - Scolnick Declaration, #3 Exhibit D - Form 5500)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah)
August 6, 2019 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re (15 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (48 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (9 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Brent Cowin's Reply Concerning Gainey McKenna & Egleston's Fraud on the Court filed by Brent Cowin. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Gonnello, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 54 BRIEF in Further Support of the Hoffmans' Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER : This matter is before the Court on Notice of Houlihan & Company LLC, Ronald A. Fish, and Jeff Lion's Motion for Consolidation of Related Actions, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Counsel Doc. #9 ,Motion by Charles D. Hoffman, HoffInvestCo, and Lydia Hoffman for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel Doc. #12 , Brett Cowin's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel Doc. 15 , and Motion of Jay Scolnick and Mark Shaner to: (1) Appoint Lead Plaintiffs; and (2) Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel Doc. #48 . The parties are ORDERED to appear before the Court for a hearing on the motions on Thursday, September 12, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., at the James H. Quillen United States Courthouse. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/06/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (CAT)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (34) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-6-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (35) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8-6-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS (KMG)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: 1. All future filings in Williams, Case no.1:19-cv-00181, and in Merelles, Case no. 1:19-cv- 00193, shall be filed in the Williams case, and that the case caption be changed to reflect "Consolidated Case No. 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS" (instead of the current "Consolidated Case No. 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS"). 2. The Clerk of Court shall disassociate Paskowitz v. CBL & Associates, et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, from Williams v. CBL & Associates, et al., Case no. 1:19-cv- 00181, and from Merelles v. CBL & Associates, et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00193, in the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 8/2/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193- JRG-CHS (GRE)
July 31, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (46 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 30 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 34 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Alexander Hood II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034501.) filed by Patrick Williams, (47 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 35 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 31 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy A. Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034507.) filed by Patrick Williams Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS(JBR)
July 31, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Discovery by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Filing 47 Administrative Notice to Counsel Klein re: Motion for Discovery #54 , requirements due by 8/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(SAC)
July 30, 2019 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT re (45 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) Response to Motion,,, by Brent Cowin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Gonnello, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (29 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Brent Cowin's Response to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions and Notice of Fraud on the Court filed by Brent Cowin. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Gonnello, Richard)
July 30, 2019 Filing 44 AFFIDAVIT in Support re (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (19 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (54 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 38 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (19 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (54 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 38 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Discovery , (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for Discovery by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Klein, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs filed by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah)
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion re (16 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (9 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) First MOTION to Consolidate Cases Notice of Non-Opposition To Competing Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Counsel filed by Houlihan and Company LLC, Ronald A. Fish, Jeff Lion. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Stranch, J.)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (15 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (30 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , (12 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (22 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (30 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re (34 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (26 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel, (23 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs, (30 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, (20 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Shaw, Scott)
July 29, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by John Collins, Joanna Lienti, Thomas Stoves re (35 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) Memorandum in Support of Motion Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Wood, Christopher)
July 29, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jeremy A. Lieberman ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034507.) by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (JBR).
July 29, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph Alexander Hood II ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4034501.) by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Johnson, Sarah) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (JBR).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS; granting (27) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-29-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS (KMG)
July 25, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of party Plaintiff Paskowitz by Laurence Paskowitz Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Bramlett, Paul)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 nORDER granting (41) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting (42) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS; granting (25) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting (26) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS; granting (29) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form; granting (30) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-23-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
July 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (25 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 29 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 41 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Klein ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028148.) filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco, (30 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 26 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJeffrey S. Abraham ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028159.) filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS(AML)
July 23, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: (25 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 29 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 41 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Klein filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco, (30 in 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, 42 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 26 in 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJeffrey S. Abraham filed by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(AWS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice forJeffrey S. Abraham ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028159.) by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael J. Klein ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4028148.) by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Chandler, John)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS; granting (23) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form in case 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-19-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS (KMG)
July 19, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard W. Gonnello ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4026446.) filed by Brent Cowin (AML)
July 18, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard W. Gonnello ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4026446.) by Brent Cowin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing of Richard W. Gonnello-USDC-SDNY)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Cain, Chris)
July 17, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Friedman Group re (29 in 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS) MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Appoint #29 Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS(Bramlett, Paul)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The actions styled Paskowitz v. CBL & Associates et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00149-JRG-CHS, Williams v. CBL & Associates et al., Case no. 1:19-cv-00181, and Merelles v. CBL & Associates et al., Case no. 1:19-CV-00193, are consolidated for all purposes pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a). All future filings in the consolidated action shall be made in Case No. 1:19- cv-00149-JRG-CHS. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 07/17/2019. (AMP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Lead Counsel and to Appoint Lead Plaintiffs by Jay Scolnick, Mark Shaner. (Attachments: #1 Other Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00181-JRG-CHS, 1:19-cv-00193-JRG-CHS, (Filed into new lead case per law clerk)(JCK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Brent Cowin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cain, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff filed by Brent Cowin. (Cain, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by Brent Cowin. (Cain, Chris)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Chandler, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel filed by Hoffinvestco, Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman. (Chandler, John)
July 16, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead and Local Counsel by Charles D. Hoffman, Lydia Hoffman, Hoffinvestco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chandler, John) Modified on 8/6/2019 to reinstate pending motion(JCK).
July 16, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Alberto Merelles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Press Release, #2 Exhibit B: Certs and Schedule A's, #3 Exhibit C: Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D: GPM Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E: Rosen Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit F: BSJ Firm Resume)(Stranch, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Alberto Merelles. (Stranch, J.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Alberto Merelles. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cert and Schedule A, #2 Other Proposed Order)(Stranch, J.) Modified on 8/6/2019 to reinstate pending motion (JCK).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-16-19. (KMG)
July 16, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Cochran ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022849.) filed by Alberto Merelles (AML)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian Cochran ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4022849.) by Alberto Merelles. (Cochran, Brian)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.. (Shaw, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Order Addressing Certain early Scheduling Matters by CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Shaw, Scott)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott M Shaw on behalf of All Defendants (Shaw, Scott)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7-10-19. (KMG)
July 9, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael I. Fistel, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4016248.) filed by Alberto Merelles (AML)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael I. Fistel, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4016248.) by Alberto Merelles. (Fistel, Michael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/3/2019. (BJL)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/3/2019. (BJL)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 7/3/2019. (BJL)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BJL)
July 3, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (BJL)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RELATING CASES. Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2(d)(3), the undersigned finds that the above-captioned case is related to Case No. 1:19-cv-149. The Court finds that these cases arise out of the same transaction or occurrence and involve one or more of the same parties. Therefore, the two cases are related. See E.D. Tenn. L.R. 3.2(d)(3)(A)(1). Because the first of these cases was assigned to District Judge J. Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Christopher H. Steger, this case will also be assigned to those same judges. However, consolidation is not ordered. This entry is the complete order of the Court. No document is attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 7/3/2019. (Steger, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Alberto Merelles. (Wood, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws against CBL & Associates Properties, Inc., A. Larry Chapman, Farzana Khaleel, Charles B. Lebovitz, Stephen D. Lebovitz ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4013474.), filed by Alberto Merelles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons CBL, #3 Summons S Lebovitz, #4 Summons C. Lebovitz, #5 Summons Khaleel, #6 Summons Chapman)(Wood, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merelles v. CBL & Associates Properties, Inc. et al (JRG1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Lebovitz
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Larry Chapman
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farzana Khaleel
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBL & Associates Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C Cook
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Lebovitz
Represented By: Scott M Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Merelles
Represented By: Christopher Martin Wood
Represented By: J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Brian E Cochran
Represented By: Michael I Fistel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jay Scolnick
Represented By: James Al Holifield, Jr
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Shaner
Represented By: James Al Holifield, Jr
Represented By: J. Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Sarah Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: Jeremy A Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Lion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hoffinvestco
Represented By: John W Chandler, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey S Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles D. Hoffman
Represented By: John W Chandler, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey S Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronald A. Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brent Cowin
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Houlihan and Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lydia Hoffman
Represented By: John W Chandler, Jr
Represented By: Michael J Klein
Represented By: Jeffrey S Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?