Rimmel v. Burke (JRG2)
Plaintiff: Mr. William Allen Rimmel, III and William Allen Rimmel, III
Defendant: Bobbie J Burke
Case Number: 1:2019cv00223
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: J Ronnie Greer
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Flores, Robin)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Bobbie J Burke (Ward, Kenneth)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court in lieu of in-person or telephonic scheduling conferences unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by plaintiff's counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 08/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent / Non Consent) (CAT)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bobbie J Burke.(Ward, Kenneth)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth W Ward on behalf of Bobbie J Burke (Ward, Kenneth)
August 11, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT served on DEFENDANT BOBBIE J. BURKE on 08/02/2019, filed by William Allen Rimmel, III. (Attachments: #1 Summons SUMMONS without endorsement from process server)(Flores, Robin)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/19. (AWS)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/19. (AWS)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on 8/2/19. (AWS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (AWS)
August 2, 2019 District Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (AWS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bobbie J Burke ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4038659.), filed by William Allen Rimmel, III. (Attachments: #1 Other civil case cover sheet, #2 Summons)(Flores, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rimmel v. Burke (JRG2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie J Burke
Represented By: Kenneth W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. William Allen Rimmel, III
Represented By: Robin R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Allen Rimmel, III
Represented By: Robin R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?