Allen v. Walmart Inc. (TV1)
Plaintiff: Jerri Allen
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP and Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00231
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Walmart Inc. (Callaway, Gregory)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Callaway, Gregory)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/9/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/2/2021
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Callaway, Gregory)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/16/19. (JBR)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/16/19. (JBR)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/16/19. (JBR)
August 16, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JBR)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Other attachment to business entity disclosure)(Callaway, Gregory)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Hamilton County, Tennessee, case number 19C839. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4050917), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons served on Wal-Mart, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Other civil cover sheet)(Callaway, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Walmart Inc. (TV1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Gregory W Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerri Allen
Represented By: Jerrold J White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?