Lowe et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Callie Lowe and Henry Allen Lowe
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00240
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Generally, scheduling orders will be entered by the Court after a telephonic scheduling conference unless otherwise requested by the parties. It is therefore ORDERED: As soon as practicable, but in no event later than 30 days from the first appearance of a defendant, or if that has already occurred, within 30 days of this order, the parties must confer, in a conference arranged by Plaintiffs' counsel, for the purpose of considering the nature and basis of their claims and defenses. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/17/2019. (CAT)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Gallagher, Mary)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Callie Lowe, Henry Allen Lowe. (Cook, Edward)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/17/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Corporate Interest by CSX Transportation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CSX Corporation for CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Gallagher, Mary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial Motion to Dismiss Memorandum in Support of CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Gallagher, Mary)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial Motion to Dismiss by CSX Transportation, Inc.. (Gallagher, Mary)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on CSX Transportation, Inc. on 8/27/19, filed by Callie Lowe, Henry Allen Lowe. (Rodgers, Lindsey)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT (Corrected) against CSX Transportation, Inc., filed by Henry Allen Lowe, Callie Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodgers, Lindsey)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/23/19. (ABF)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/23/19. (ABF)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 8/23/19. (ABF)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CSX Transportation, Inc.. (ABF)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 Administrative Notice to Counsel re #1 Complaint : Requirements due by 8/28/2019. The complaint is formatted like a book with 2 pages side by side on one sheet. Please correct the format and refile.(ABF)
August 22, 2019 District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CSX Transportation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4059003.), filed by Henry Allen Lowe, Callie Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rodgers, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe et al v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Callie Lowe
Represented By: Lindsey A. Rodgers
Represented By: William Paul Leverett, Jr
Represented By: Edward S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Allen Lowe
Represented By: Lindsey A. Rodgers
Represented By: William Paul Leverett, Jr
Represented By: Edward S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Cardwell
Represented By: Mary T Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?