Cates v. Robinson Manufacturing Company (PLR1)
Plaintiff: Erica Cates
Defendant: Robinson Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00247
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Pamela L Reeves
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/19 is CANCELED and RESCHEDULED for 10/31/2019 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/8/19. (JBR)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Robinson Manufacturing Company (Malloy-Thorpe, Jessica)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/20/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3C - Knoxville before District Judge Pamela L Reeves. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 10/1/19. (JBR)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on September 30, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non-Consent Form) (SAC)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Robinson Manufacturing Company. (Bode, John)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robinson Manufacturing Company.(Bode, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erica Cates. Robinson Manufacturing Company served on 9/10/2019. (Ward, Joshua)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/2019. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/2019. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/2019. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Notice to Counsel, Informational only, No action to be taken. Address information should not have been entered and the civil cover sheet and summons should not be filed in a fillable format. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robinson Manufacturing Company. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 District Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JCK)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4064733.), filed by Erica Cates. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Coversheet, #2 Summons Summons Robinson Manufacturing Company)(Hargraves, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cates v. Robinson Manufacturing Company (PLR1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Cates
Represented By: Robert Ethan Hargraves
Represented By: Joshua R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?