Stone Door Group, LLC v. Meade et al (TV2)
Plaintiff: Stone Door Group, LLC
Defendant: Effectual Intellectual, LLC and Alex Meade
Case Number: 1:2019cv00271
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Christopher H Steger
Referring Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/23/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/12/19. (JBR)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 11/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS)
November 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alex Meade.(Nelson, Jesse)
November 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Stone Door Group, LLC by Effectual Intellectual, LLC.(Nelson, Jesse)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to and including November 11, 2019, in which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 10-21-19.This entry constitutes the Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this Order. (KMG) Modified on 10/21/2019 to correct party (BJL).
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Effectual Intellectual, LLC, Alex Meade. (Nelson, Jesse)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Stone Door Group, LLC. (Killian, William)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/23/19. (JBR)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/23/19. (JBR)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 9/23/19. (JBR)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Effectual Intellectual, LLC, Alex Meade. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Effectual Inellectual, LLC)(JBR)
September 23, 2019 NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Stone Door Group, LLC. (JBR)
September 23, 2019 District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (JBR)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4084299.), filed by Stone Door Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Summons to Alex Meade, #5 Summons Summons to Effectual Intellectual c/o Registered Agent United States Corporation Agents, Inc.)(Christopher, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone Door Group, LLC v. Meade et al (TV2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Effectual Intellectual, LLC
Represented By: Jesse D Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Meade
Represented By: Jesse D Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stone Door Group, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Christopher
Represented By: William C Killian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?