Hays v. Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority
Plaintiff: Mark Hays
Defendant: Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority d/b/a Erlanger Health System and Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00291
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Susan K Lee
Referring Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/1/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2021 04:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 12/5/19. (AWS)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority (Harrison, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harrison, John)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/2019. (KTC)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge) (AML)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority. (Harrison, John)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority.(Harrison, John)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/19. (JBR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/19. (JBR)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/21/19. (JBR)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority. (JBR)
October 21, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (JBR)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority d/b/a Erlanger Health System ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4108099.), filed by Mark Hays. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(McDearman, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hays v. Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority d/b/a Erlanger Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga-Hamilton County Hospital Authority
Represented By: John C Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hays
Represented By: James S McDearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?