Yishra'el v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Omar Qolayah Yishra'el
Defendant: C Mullinix, Eric Diaz, Burlon Hayworth, David Myrick, Jamie Heath, Brian Desmond, Kevin Wilson and Eric Geren
Case Number: 1:2019cv00292
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Clifton L Corker
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT re #10 Order: This case came before the Court on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] and Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee's Report and Recommendation [Doc. 8]. For the reasons stated in the Court's Order adopting Judge Lee's Report and Recommendation, it is ORDERED AND ADJUGED that this action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2019. (Copy of Judgment mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el) (CAT)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying as moot #7 Motion to Seal Case; adopting Report and Recommendations re #8 Report and Recommendations. After careful consideration of the record as a whole and the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge, and for the reasons set out in that Report and Recommendation which are incorporated by reference herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation [Doc. 8] is ADOPTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 1] and Motion to Seal Case [Doc. 7] are DENIED AS MOOT, with no filing fee assessed. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 11/25/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el) (CAT)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations, filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(AML)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Complaint filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 11/5/2019. (AML) Mailed to Omar Qolayah Yishra'el
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Case by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (Attachments: #1 Letter from State of Tennessee Treasury Department, #2 Affidavit of Recording, #3 Envelope) (AMP)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el.
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el.
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/21/2019. (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (AML) Mailed to Plaintiff Yishra'el
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Brian Desmond, Eric Diaz, Eric Geren, Burlon Hayworth, Jamie Heath, C Mullinix, David Myrick, Kevin Wilson, filed by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el.(AML)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Omar Qolayah Yishra'el. (AML)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yishra'el v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Qolayah Yishra'el
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Mullinix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlon Hayworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Myrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Geren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?