Jackson v. Chattanooga Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Lebron Jackson
Defendant: Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC and Chattanooga Housing Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00297
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Referring Judge: Christopher H Steger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/12/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/25/2019. (AML)
November 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger: Scheduling Conference held on 11/25/2019 in chambers without court reporter/courtroom deputy. (SAC)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11-25-19. (KMG)
November 25, 2019 Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katharine B. Fischman filed by Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC, Chattanooga Housing Authority (GRE)
November 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katharine B. Fischman by Chattanooga Housing Authority, Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC. (Montgomery, Mekesha)
November 21, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McDonald, Stephen)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/25/2019 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger. (KMG)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE and ORDER REFERRING CASE.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on November 4, 2019. (SAC)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CONSENT by Phillip Lebron Jackson (Ward, Joshua)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on October 29, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Non- Consent Form) (SAC)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/29/2019. (KTC)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Chattanooga Housing Authority, Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC.(Montgomery, Mekesha)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/25/2019. (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/25/2019. (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 10/25/2019. (AMP)
October 25, 2019 District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (AMP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC. (Montgomery, Mekesha)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Chattanooga Housing Authority. (Montgomery, Mekesha)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Chancery Court, case number 19-0703. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4114303), filed by Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC, Chattanooga Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hamilton County Chancery Court Pleadings, #2 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Montgomery, Mekesha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Chattanooga Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Housing Authority-Emerald Villages, LLC
Represented By: Lynda Motes Hill
Represented By: Mekesha Houchins Montgomery
Represented By: Katharine Beatrice Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Housing Authority
Represented By: Lynda Motes Hill
Represented By: Mekesha Houchins Montgomery
Represented By: Katharine Beatrice Fischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Lebron Jackson
Represented By: Stephen Kyle McDonald
Represented By: Joshua R Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?